Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2771935

EP2771935 - HYDROGEN GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intelligent Energy, Inc.
1731 Technology Drive, No.755
San Jose, CA 95110 / US
[2014/36]
Inventor(s)01 / LANGAN, Richard A.
5602 Ely Vista
Parma, Ohio 44129 / US
02 / STIMITS, Jason L.
270 Utopia Circle
Merrit Island FL 32952 / US
03 / LAW, Chad E.
1620 Berlin Street
Milan, Ohio 44846 / US
04 / BARTON, Russell H.
332 Keary Street
New Westminster British Columbia V3L 3L3 / CA
05 / KMETICH, Thomas J.
2938 Lamplight Lane
Willoughby Hills, Ohio 44094 / US
06 / FISHER, Allison M.
16030 Erhart Northern Road
Valley City, Ohio 44280 / US
07 / ZHENG, Guanghong
3622 Blackberry Lane
Westlake, Ohio 44145 / US
08 / VANDERLEEDEN, Olen
33 Hett Creek Drive
Port Moody British Columbia V3H 4Z7 / CA
 [2014/39]
Former [2014/36]01 / LANGAN, Richard A.
5602 Ely Vista
Parma, Ohio 44129 / US
02 / STIMITS, Jason L.
38202 Heron Lane
Avon, Ohio 44011 / US
03 / LAW, Chad E.
1620 Berlin Street
Milan, Ohio 44846 / US
04 / BARTON, Russell H.
332 Keary Street
New Westminster British Columbia V3L 3L3 / CA
05 / KMETICH, Thomas J.
2938 Lamplight Lane
Willoughby Hills, Ohio 44094 / US
06 / FISHER, Allison M.
16030 Erhart Northern Road
Valley City, Ohio 44280 / US
07 / ZHENG, Guanghong
3622 Blackberry Lane
Westlake, Ohio 44145 / US
08 / VANDERLEEDEN, Olen
33 Hett Creek Drive
Port Moody British Columbia V3H 4Z7 / CA
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/17]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2014/36]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Application number, filing date12781550.425.10.2012
[2016/17]
WO2012US61759
Priority number, dateUS201161551487P26.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161551487 P
US201161559329P14.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161559329 P
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013063169
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2771935
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2771935
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04, H01M8/06, C01B3/04, F17C11/00, C01B3/00
[2015/49]
Former International [2014/36]H01M8/06, H01M8/04, C01B3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:WASSERSTOFFGENERATOR[2014/36]
English:HYDROGEN GENERATOR[2014/36]
French:GÉNÉRATEUR D'HYDROGÈNE[2014/36]
Entry into regional phase23.05.2014National basic fee paid 
23.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
15.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2016Fee for grant paid
11.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.11.2015
Opposition(s)30.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.10.2012
AL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE25.10.2016
LU25.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU25.10.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
TR27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE25.10.2016
LU25.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/38]HU25.10.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE25.10.2016
LU25.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU25.10.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE25.10.2016
LU25.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/30]HU25.10.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE25.10.2016
LU25.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/51]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE25.10.2016
LU25.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/43]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
LU25.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IT27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.04.2016
ES27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2469248  (QINETIQ LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20 * page 7, paragraph 0021 * * page 8, paragraph 0024 - page 16, paragraph 0047 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO2006093094  (TAIHEIYO CEMENT CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1-4c *;
 [A]EP1443581  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 3, paragraph 0025 - page 4, paragraph 0041 * * figures 2-3 * * page 5, paragraph 0040 - paragraph 0047 *;
 [A]JP2005067990  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * pages 1-12 *;
 [A]JP2002228099  (SONY CORP) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 1 *
by applicantUS2011027168
 US7867441
 US6749702
 US7964111
 US2008236032
 US2008241613
    - VARMA ET AL., CHEM. ENG. SCI, (2010), vol. 65, pages 80 - 87,
    - INT. J HYDROGEN EN, (2007), vol. 32, pages 207 - 211,