blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2771935


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
22.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.07.2018  [2018/30]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
20.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.11.2017  [2017/47]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
03.03.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.04.2017  [2017/14]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
30.09.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
25.03.2016 (Expected) grant published on  27.04.2016  [2016/17]
15.03.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
15.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
15.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.11.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
04.11.2015 Change - classification published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
04.11.2015 Change - classification published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
03.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.02.2015  [2015/06]
30.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
22.08.2014 Change - inventor published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
01.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
01.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  03.09.2014  [2014/36]
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
18.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
03.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication