blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2771935
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9543604Global Dossier 10.01.2017B2
US2016104907 14.04.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201414301960 11.06.2014
US201161559329 14.11.2011
US201213659938 25.10.2012
US201161551487 26.10.2011
US201414506260 03.10.2014
US201514975485 18.12.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9231264Global Dossier 05.01.2016B2
US2015023846 22.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201414301960 11.06.2014
US201161559329 14.11.2011
US201213659938 25.10.2012
US201161551487 26.10.2011
US201414506260 03.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8916305Global Dossier 23.12.2014B2
US2014295304 02.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414301960 11.06.2014
US201161559329 14.11.2011
US201213659938 25.10.2012
US201161551487 26.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8771889Global Dossier 08.07.2014B2
US2013108940 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161559329 14.11.2011
US201213659938 25.10.2012
US201161551487 26.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2771935Global Dossier 27.04.2016B1
EP2771935 03.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201161559329 14.11.2011
WO2012US61759 25.10.2012
US201161551487 26.10.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013063169Global Dossier 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201161559329 14.11.2011
US201161551487 26.10.2011