Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2705491

EP2705491 - AUTOMATIC SUMMARY OF CHANGES TO DOCUMENTS IN ELECTRONIC MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/11]CHANGES TO DOCUMENTS ARE AUTOMATICALLY SUMMARIZED IN ELECTRONIC MESSAGES
[2019/07]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CZ
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2014/11]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COSTENARO, Daniel Paul
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / BROWN, Jedidiah
c/o Microsoft Corporation
LCA - International Patents
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2014/11]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/26]
Former [2014/11]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date12782472.005.05.2012
[2019/26]
WO2012US36701
Priority number, dateUS20111310243106.05.2011         Original published format: US201113102431
[2014/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012154630
Date:15.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2705491
Date:12.03.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012
[2014/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2705491
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.03.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/24, G06Q50/30
[2015/02]
Former International [2014/11]G06Q50/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/11]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE ZUSAMMENFASSUNG VON DOKUMENTÄNDERUNGEN IN ELEKTRONISCHEN NACHRICHTEN[2014/11]
English:AUTOMATIC SUMMARY OF CHANGES TO DOCUMENTS IN ELECTRONIC MESSAGES[2019/07]
French:MODIFICATIONS APPORTÉES À DES DOCUMENTS AUTOMATIQUEMENT RÉSUMÉES DANS DES MESSAGES ÉLECTRONIQUES[2014/11]
Former [2014/11]CHANGES TO DOCUMENTS ARE AUTOMATICALLY SUMMARIZED IN ELECTRONIC MESSAGES
Entry into regional phase06.11.2013National basic fee paid 
06.11.2013Search fee paid 
06.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
06.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/11]
02.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2019Fee for grant paid
13.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.01.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL26.06.2019
CZ26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2019/51]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
BG26.09.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
LV26.06.2019
RS26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
GR27.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL26.06.2019
FI26.06.2019
HR26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
SE26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI26.06.2019
LT26.06.2019
NO26.09.2019
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US2007271502  (BEDI BHARAT VEER [GB], et al);
 [A]US2008059539  (CHIN RICHARD [US], et al);
 [A]US2007118794  (HOLLANDER JOSEF [US], et al);
 [A]US2006294455  (MORRIS BENJAMIN R [US], et al)