Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: WO2012154367

WO2012154367 - SECURE USER CREDENTIAL CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.08.2014
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2014  [2014/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Konvax Corporation
485 Massachusetts Avenue Suite 300
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
For all designated states
Talamo, Maurizio
Via Emanuele Filiberto 233
00185 Rome / IT
For all designated states
Arcieri, Franco
Via Mario Chiri 25
00177 Rome / IT
For all designated states
Marinelli, Guido, Maria
Viale Appio Claudio 36
00178 Rome / IT
For all designated states
Schunck, Christian, H.
Via Umberto Biancamano 33
00185 Rome / IT
[N/P]
Inventor(s)01 / TALAMO, Maurizio
Via Emanuele Filiberto 233
I-00185 Rome / IT
02 / ARCIERI, Franco
Via Mario Chiri 25
I-00177 Rome / IT
03 / MARINELLI, Guido, Maria
Viale Appio Claudio 36
I-00178 Rome / IT
04 / SCHUNCK, Christian, H.
Via Umberto Biancamano 33
I-00185 Rome / IT
[N/P]
Application number, filing date12782477.912.04.2012
WO2012US33262
Priority number, dateUS20111310624512.05.2011         Original published format: US201113106245
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012154367
Date:15.11.2012
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search reportKR14.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/00, H04L9/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR 
TitleEnglish:SECURE USER CREDENTIAL CONTROL
French:CONTRÔLE SÉCURISÉ D'UN AUTHENTIFIANT D'UTILISATEUR
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/37]
13.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/37]
23.04.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time  [2014/37]
Public notificationsNoting of loss of rights pursuant to Rule 112(1) EPC (EPO Form 1205A dated 20/02/2014)
Konvax Corporation
485 Massachusetts Avenue Suite 300
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
[2014/17]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US2004003258  (BILLINGSLEY ERIC N [US], et al);
 [A]US2006206919  (MONTGOMERY MICHAEL A [US], et al);
 [A]US2007005500  (STEEVES DAVID J [US], et al);
 [A]US2006080545  (BAGLEY BRIAN B [US])