Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2707806

EP2707806 - MANAGING NETWORK INTERACTION FOR DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.03.2018  [2018/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sysorex USA
17 East Sir Francis Drake Boulevard, Suite 110
Larkspur, CA 94939 / US
[2016/20]
Former [2014/12]For all designated states
Airpatrol Corporation
8171 Maple Lawn Boulevard
Suite 310
Maple Lawn, MD 20759 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LEVY-YURISTA, Guy
964 Farm Haven Drive
Rockville Maryland 20852 / US
02 / MADEY, Daniel A.
292 Aston Forest Lane
Crownsville Maryland 21032 / US
03 / POLLUTRO, Dennis V.
8613 Knowlton Road
Clymer New York 14724 / US
 [2014/12]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1
20355 Hamburg / DE
[2014/12]
Application number, filing date12782594.111.05.2012
WO2012US37478
Priority number, dateUS201161485199P12.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161485199 P
US201161487438P18.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161487438 P
[2014/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012155026
Date:15.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2707806
Date:19.03.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.11.2012
[2014/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.11.2012
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/173, H04W4/02, H04W8/00, H04L29/12, H04L29/06, H04W12/08
[2014/46]
Former International [2014/12]G06F15/173
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/12]
TitleGerman:NETZWERKINTERAKTIONSVERWALTUNG FÜR VORRICHTUNGEN[2014/12]
English:MANAGING NETWORK INTERACTION FOR DEVICES[2014/12]
French:GESTION D'INTERACTION DE RÉSEAU POUR DES DISPOSITIFS[2014/12]
Entry into regional phase12.12.2013National basic fee paid 
12.12.2013Search fee paid 
12.12.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
12.12.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.12.2013Examination requested  [2014/12]
07.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/10]
17.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/10]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.04.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2007044597  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] *;
 [X]US2010164715  (BULLER MATTHEW [GB], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0029] *;
 [A]WO2007081395  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0023] - [0026] *
International search[X]US2011075191  (MEUNIER JEAN-LUC [FR], et al);
 [Y]US6473609  (SCHWARTZ BRUCE V [US], et al);
 [A]US2007030826  (ZHANG TAO [US], et al);
 [A]US2010130212  (SO TRICCI [US], et al)