Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786326

EP2786326 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISPLAYING E-MAIL MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.10.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unify GmbH & Co. KG
Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 6
80807 München / DE
[2016/41]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Unify GmbH & Co. KG
Hofmannstrasse 51
81379 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LEDERER, Thomas
Enzianstr. 20 b
82211 Herrsching / DE
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Fritzsche, Thomas , et al
Fritzsche Patent
Naupliastraße 110
81545 München / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12783107.112.10.2012
WO2012EP04287
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014056516
Date:17.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786326
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2014
[2014/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/10
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANZEIGE VON E-MAIL-NACHRICHTEN[2014/41]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DISPLAYING E-MAIL MESSAGES[2014/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR AFFICHER DES MESSAGES DE COURRIER ÉLECTRONIQUE[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2014National basic fee paid 
01.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
26.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination15.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1227/17
25.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
26.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
22.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201807   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]US6985923  (BATES CARY LEE [US] ET AL) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2008023069  (MILLNET FINANCIAL LTD [GB]; MOESKOPS JAMES [GB]; LAWSON GARY [GB]) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2005198579  (PEREPA BHARGAV V [US] ET AL) [I] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011258264  (BREMNER RICHARD [AU] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5835084  (BAILEY STEVEN J [US] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *