Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2755817

EP2755817 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A TIRE BEAD CORE ASSEMBLY, A TIRE BEAD CORE ASSEMBLY FORMING APPARATUS, A TIRE BEAD CORE ASSEMBLY, A TIRE, A BEAD FILLER INTERMEDIATE AND A USE OF A COMPRESSION MOULD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2017  [2017/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Franke, Robert, Wilhelmus
Dr. Staringstraat 11
7582 BL Losser / NL
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/30]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12783351.514.09.2012
WO2012NL50649
Priority number, dateNL2011200741414.09.2011         Original published format: NL 2007414
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013039398
Date:21.03.2013
Language:EN
[2013/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2755817
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013
[2014/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29D30/48
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WULSTKERNS FÜR LUFTREIFEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WULSTKERNS FÜR LUFTREIFEN, WULSTKERN FÜR LUFTREIFEN, REIFEN, WULSTFÜLLER-ZWISCHENPRODUKT UND VERWENDUNG EINES PRESSWERKZEUGS DAFÜR[2014/30]
English:A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING A TIRE BEAD CORE ASSEMBLY, A TIRE BEAD CORE ASSEMBLY FORMING APPARATUS, A TIRE BEAD CORE ASSEMBLY, A TIRE, A BEAD FILLER INTERMEDIATE AND A USE OF A COMPRESSION MOULD[2014/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ENSEMBLE TRINGLE DE TALON DE PNEUMATIQUE, APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'ENSEMBLE TRINGLE DE TALON DE PNEUMATIQUE, ENSEMBLE TRINGLE DE TALON DE PNEUMATIQUE, PNEUMATIQUE, INTERMÉDIAIRE DE BOURRAGE SUR TRINGLE ET UTILISATION D'UN MOULE DE COMPRESSION[2014/30]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2014National basic fee paid 
14.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/30]
24.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/37]
08.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XIY]DE102005035725  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO [JP]) [X] 1-6,8-16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] - [0040]; figure - * [I] 7 [Y] 5,7;
 [X]JPS60157840  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1-4,8-16 * abstract *;
 [X]WO2010134475  (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-2,7-16 * abstract *;
 [XY]JP2008246878  (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO) [X] 1-4,6,8-16 * abstract * [Y] 5,7;
 [X]JP2006159719  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1-16 * abstract *;
 [A]JPS63154334  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
by applicantUS5632836
 US6089294
 DE102005035725
 JPS63154334
 JPS60157840
 JP2006159719
 JP2008246878
 WO2010134475