Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2771275

EP2771275 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SYNTHESIS GAS FOR METHANOL PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stamicarbon B.V. acting under the name of MT Innovation Center
Mercator 3
6135 KW Sittard / NL
[2014/36]
Inventor(s)01 / IAQUANIELLO, Gaetano
c/o Viale Castello della Magliana 75
I-00148 Rome / IT
02 / ANTONETTI, Elena
c/o Viale Castello della Magliana 75
I-00148 Rome / IT
03 / CONTALDO, Palma
c/o Viale Castello della Magliana 75
I-00148 Rome / IT
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2019/30]
Former [2014/36]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date12783359.826.10.2012
[2019/30]
WO2012NL50748
Priority number, dateEP2011018676426.10.2011         Original published format: EP 11186764
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013062415
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2771275
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2771275
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:C01B3/38, C01B3/48, C07C29/151
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SYNTHESEGAS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHANOL[2019/11]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING SYNTHESIS GAS FOR METHANOL PRODUCTION[2014/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE GAZ SYNTHÉTIQUE POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MÉTHANOL[2019/11]
Former [2014/36]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SYNTHESEGAS ZUR METHANOLPRODUKTION
Former [2014/36]PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SYNGAZ POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MÉTHANOL
Entry into regional phase12.05.2014National basic fee paid 
12.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
11.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.06.2019Fee for grant paid
12.06.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.06.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
29.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[IY]EP1219566  (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [I] 1-4,9-11 * paragraphs [0005] , [0025] , [0029] , [0030] , [0033] , [0034]; figure 1; claims 1,4,5,8,10,11,15,16 * [Y] 5-8,12,13;
 [YA]WO2006117499  (QUARTEY-PAPAFIO ALEXANDER H [GB]) [Y] 5-8 * paragraphs [0001] , [0032] - [0035] - [0043]; figure 3 * [A] 1-4,9-11;
 [YA]US5252609  (PINTO ALWYN [GB]) [Y] 5-8 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 7 * * column 7, lines 20-29 * * column 8, lines 36-41 * [A] 1-4,9-11;
 [A]US2008275143  (MALHOTRA AVINASH [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0019] , [0 31] , [0 33] , [0 55] , [0071] , [0074]; figures 1,8 *;
 [A]EP2199254  (BP PLC [GB]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0 41]; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]WO2011072877  (ENI SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 13, lines 10-28 *;
 [Y]  - Rainer Reimert ET AL, "Gas Production, 5. Examples of Complex Gas Production Plants", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, Weinheim, Germany, Wiley-VCH Verlag GmbH & Co. KGaA, (20111015), doi:10.1002/14356007.o12_o04, ISBN 978-3-52-730673-2, XP055049320 [Y] 12,13 * page 557 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/14356007.o12_o04
 [AD]  - BASINI ET AL, "Fuel rich catalytic combustion: Principles and technological developments in short contact time (SCT) catalytic processes", CATALYSIS TODAY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 117, no. 4, ISSN 0920-5861, (20061015), pages 384 - 393, (20061015), XP027976254 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *
ExaminationWO0136323
 WO0132556
 US2004101473
by applicantEP0233076
 WO9737929
 EP0640559
 WO0000426
 WO0132556
 WO0136323
    - L. BASINI, CATALYSIS TODAY, (2006), vol. 117, pages 384 - 393
    - L. BASINI; K. AASBERG-PETERSEN; A. GUARINONI; M. OESTBERG, "Catalytic Partial Oxidation of Natural Gas at Elevated Pressure and Low Residence Time", CATALYSIS TODAY, (2001), vol. 64, pages 9 - 20
    - H. HICKMAN; L.D. SCHMIDT, J. CATAL., (1992), vol. 138, page 267
    - D. HICHMAN; L.D. SCHMIDT, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, page 343