Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2772038

EP2772038 - VERIFICATION OF INTEGRITY OF PEER-RECEIVED CONTENT IN A PEER-TO-PEER CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE, ES, SK
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
[2018/33]
Former [2018/16]For all designated states
Alcatel Lucent
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
Former [2014/36]For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CAKULEV, Violeta
4 Haran Circle
Millburn, NJ 07041 / US
02 / MIZIKOVSKY, Semyan, B.
227 Yellowknife Road
Morganville, NJ 07751 / US
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Nokia EPO representatives
Nokia Technologies Oy
Karaportti 3
02610 Espoo / FI
[N/P]
Former [2018/33]Berthier, Karine , et al
Alcatel-Lucent International
Patent Business
Site Nokia Paris Saclay
Route de Villejust
91620 Nozay / FR
Former [2014/36]Hirsch & Associés
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12783766.422.10.2012
[2018/33]
WO2012US61360
Priority number, dateUS201161551056P25.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161551056 P
US20121334498506.01.2012         Original published format: US201213344985
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013062918
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2772038
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2772038
Date:15.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08, H04L29/06
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERPRÜFUNG DER INTEGRITÄT VON PEER-SEITIG EMPFANGENEN INHALTEN IN EINEM PEER-TO-PEER-INHALTSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM[2014/36]
English:VERIFICATION OF INTEGRITY OF PEER-RECEIVED CONTENT IN A PEER-TO-PEER CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM[2014/36]
French:VÉRIFICATION DE L'INTÉGRITÉ D'UN CONTENU REÇU PAR DES PAIRS DANS UN SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENUS DE PAIR À PAIR[2014/36]
Entry into regional phase15.05.2014National basic fee paid 
15.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
05.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2018Fee for grant paid
05.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
EE15.08.2018
ES15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
SK15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/22]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
CZ15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
PL15.08.2018
RO15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
IT15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL15.08.2018
AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
LV15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
HR15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT15.08.2018
FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
RS15.08.2018
SE15.08.2018
BG15.11.2018
NO15.11.2018
GR16.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI15.08.2018
LT15.08.2018
NO15.11.2018
IS15.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT15.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003233455  (LEBER MIKE [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 27] - [0029] - [0 33] - [0043] - [0 53] , [0 66] - [0075]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]  - SCHULZRINNE COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY E MAROCCO TELECOM ITALIA E IVOV SIP COMMUNICATOR H, "Security Issues and Solutions in Peer-to-Peer Systems for Realtime Communications; rfc5765.txt", SECURITY ISSUES AND SOLUTIONS IN PEER-TO-PEER SYSTEMS FOR REALTIME COMMUNICATIONS; RFC5765.TXT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF; STANDARD, INTERNET SOCIETY (ISOC) 4, RUE DES FALAISES CH- 1205 GENEVA, SWITZERLAND, (20100223), pages 1 - 28, XP015068196 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph l - page 13, paragraph l * * page 15, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 1 *
 [A]  - JIE KONG ET AL, "A study of pollution on BitTorrent", COMPUTER AND AUTOMATION ENGINEERING (ICCAE), 2010 THE 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100226), ISBN 978-1-4244-5585-0, pages 118 - 122, XP031671778 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 119, column l, paragraph 2 - page 120, paragraph 4 * * figure 1 *