Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2773458 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 133
16.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
16.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
16.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
16.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
20.06.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
06.06.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
04.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.06.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
01.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
01.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
14.03.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
30.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
10.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
10.05.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 43
23.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
23.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
23.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4