Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2773458


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
02.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.02.2015  [2015/06]
18.12.2014 Amendment by applicant
30.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
08.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  10.09.2014  [2014/37]
22.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
20.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication