EP2773638 - HETEROARYL PYRIDONE AND AZA-PYRIDONE COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF BTK ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/37] | For all designated states F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAWFORD, James John c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
ORTWINE, Daniel Fred c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
WEI, BinQing c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
YOUNG, Wendy B. c/o Genentech Inc. 1 DNA Way South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2014/37] | Representative(s) | Sauer, Frank F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2014/37] | Application number, filing date | 12783837.3 | 02.11.2012 | [2015/41] | WO2012US63194 | Priority number, date | US201161555393P | 03.11.2011 Original published format: US 201161555393 P | [2014/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013067274 | Date: | 10.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2773638 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2773638 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D471/14, C07D487/04, C07D495/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/4985, C07D487/14, A61K31/381, A61K31/4353, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D487/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/497 (CN);
A61K31/4985 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4995 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/501 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/5025 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/5383 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K9/20 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP);
C07D405/14 (EP);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D471/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,CN,US);
C07D495/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D495/14 (EP,CN,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D513/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,CN,US);
C07F7/1804 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HETEROARYLPYRIDON- UND AZA-PYRIDONVERBINDUNGEN ALS BTK-AKTIVITÄTS-HEMMER | [2014/37] | English: | HETEROARYL PYRIDONE AND AZA-PYRIDONE COMPOUNDS AS INHIBITORS OF BTK ACTIVITY | [2014/37] | French: | COMPOSÉS HÉTÉROARYL PYRIDONES ET AZA-PYRIDONES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE L'ACTIVITÉ BTK | [2014/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 16.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15188086.1 / EP3002284 | EP19152979.1 / EP3521288 | EP21171114.8 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | SM | 07.10.2015 | IS | 07.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | MK | 07.10.2015 | |
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | SM | 07.10.2015 | |
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/27] | IS | 07.02.2016 | |
Former [2016/25] | LV | 07.10.2015 | |
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | IS | 07.02.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2009039397 (CGI PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-29 * example - ** claim - *; | [A]WO2010100070 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-29 * example - * * claim - *; | [A]WO2010122038 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-29 * example - * * claim - * | by applicant | US3773919 | WO9615111 | US5583024 | US5674713 | US5700670 | US6602677 | US2004254066 | WO2006053121 | WO2007044515 | US2008125417 | US2008139557 | US7393848 | US7405295 | US2009318448 | WO2010056875 | US7838523 | US7884108 | US2011118233 | US7947835 | - DI PAOLO ET AL., NATURE CHEM. BIOL., (2011), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 41 - 50 | - LIU ET AL., JOUR. OF PHARM. AND EXPER. THER., (2011), vol. 338, no. 1, pages 154 - 163 | - LIU, DRUG METAB. AND DISPOSITION, (2011), vol. 39, no. 10, pages 1840 - 1849 | - The Chemistry of Heterocyclic Compounds, A series of Monographs, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1950), vol. 13, 14, | - J. AM. CHCM. SOC., (1960), vol. 82, page 5566 | - ANGEW CHEM. INTL. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 183 - 186 | - BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1973), vol. 22, page 3099 | - HONIGBERG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2010), vol. 107, no. 29, pages 13075 - 13080 | - CROUCH ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1993), vol. 160, pages 81 - 88 | - CREE, ANTICANCER DRUGS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 398 - 404 | - Remington's Phannaceutical Sciences, MACK PUBLISHING CO. | - Comprehensive Heterocyclic Chemistry II, ELSEVIER, (1997), vol. 3 | - LIEBIGS ANNALEN DER CHEMIE, pages 1910 - 16 | - HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1958), vol. 41, pages 1052 - 60 | - ARZNEIMITTEL-FORSCHUNG, (1990), vol. 40, no. 12, pages 1328 - 31 | - LOUIS F. FIESER; MARY FIESER, Reagentsfor Organic Synthesis, WILEY, (1967), vol. 1-23 | - SUZUKI, PURE APPL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 63, pages 419 - 422 | - MIYAURA; SUZUKI, CHEM. REVIEWS, (1979), vol. 95, no. 7, pages 2457 - 2483 | - SUZUKI, J. ORGANOMETAL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 576, pages 147 - 168 | - WOLF; BUCHWALD, ORG. SYNTH COLL., (2004), vol. 10, page 423 | - PAUL ET AL., JOUR. AMER. CHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 116, pages 5969 - 5970 | - LOCHMULLER, C. H., J. CHROMATOGR., (1975), vol. 113, no. 3, pages 283 - 302 | - E.; WILCN, S., Stereochemistry of Organic Compounds, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1994), page 322 | - JACOB III., J. ORG. CHEM., (1982), vol. 47, page 4165 | - OKAMOTO, J. CHROMATOGR., (1990), vol. 513, pages 375 - 378 | - ORGANIC PREPARATIONS AND PROCEDURES INT., vol. 29, no. 4, pages 471 - 498 | WO2011US50034 | WO2011US50013 |