Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2765879

EP2765879 - VISOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.12.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pinlock Patent B.V.
Zilverparkkade 135
8232 WL Lelystad / NL
[2015/16]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
HD Inspiration Holding B.V.
Zilverparkkade 135
8232 WL Lelystad / NL
Inventor(s)01 / ARNOLD, Derek, Leslie
Jupiterstraat 26
NL-8303 ZV Emmeloord / NL
 [2014/34]
Representative(s)Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
[2014/34]
Application number, filing date12784084.111.10.2012
[2016/08]
WO2012NL50713
Priority number, dateGB2011001752211.10.2011         Original published format: GB 201117522
[2014/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013055217
Date:18.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2765879
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013
[2014/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2765879
Date:24.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:A42B3/22
[2014/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VISIER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2014/34]
English:VISOR AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE[2014/34]
French:VISIÈRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION[2014/34]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2014National basic fee paid 
12.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
05.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2015Fee for grant paid
11.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16150652.2  / EP3025603
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.08.2015
Opposition(s)25.11.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.10.2012
AL24.02.2016
AT24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
IS24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
MK24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
TR24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
MT31.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU11.10.2012
AT24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
IS24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
MK24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
TR24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU11.10.2012
AT24.02.2016
CY24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
IS24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
MK24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/28]HU11.10.2012
AT24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
MC24.02.2016
MK24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/41]AT24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2017/12]AT24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SI24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
BG24.05.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
BE31.10.2016
Former [2016/50]AT24.02.2016
CZ24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RO24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
SK24.02.2016
SM24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/49]AT24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
EE24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/46]AT24.02.2016
DK24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/39]AT24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
LV24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
RS24.02.2016
SE24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/38]AT24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
PT24.06.2016
Former [2016/36]AT24.02.2016
ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
LT24.02.2016
PL24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
Former [2016/35]ES24.02.2016
FI24.02.2016
HR24.02.2016
NO24.05.2016
GR25.05.2016
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2008075953  (HD INSPIRATION HOLDING B V [NL], et al) [AD] 1 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 26; figure 1 *;
 [A]US6547390  (BERNHEIM EDWARD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 23-64 *;
 [AD]WO0218986  (BARRACK JUNE [GB]) [AD] 1 * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 22; figure 1 * * page 5, lines 2-18 *;
 [A]US6113813  (GOUDJIL KAMAL [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 26 *
by applicantWO0113750
 WO0218986
 WO2008075953