blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2765879 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2765879



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 171
04.01.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.02.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.01.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.12.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
11.12.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.12.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
12.08.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.08.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.08.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.08.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
30.07.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
30.07.2015 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.07.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
01.06.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
11.03.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
27.02.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.02.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.01.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
05.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.12.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
05.12.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
05.12.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
05.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.11.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
07.11.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
23.07.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.05.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.04.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
21.02.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
20.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
20.06.2013 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
14.05.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
18.04.2013 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 21
15.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 4
15.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
15.04.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
11.10.2012 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
11.10.2012 Claims International Searching Authority 3
11.10.2012 Description International Searching Authority 13
11.10.2012 Drawings International Searching Authority 4