blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2765879


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
08.09.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
07.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
17.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
30.12.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  01.02.2017  [2017/05]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
26.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.09.2016  [2016/39]
19.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
29.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.08.2016  [2016/35]
22.01.2016 (Expected) grant published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
15.01.2016 Change - divisional application(s) published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
15.12.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
14.12.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
29.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.08.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.07.2015 Deletion: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.03.2015 Change - applicant published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
11.03.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
27.02.2015 First examination report
12.12.2014 Change - extension states published on  14.01.2015  [2015/03]
09.12.2014 Amendment by applicant
28.10.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
18.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
13.06.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
20.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication