Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2765925

EP2765925 - METHODS AND INSTRUMENTS FOR SUBCHONDRAL TREATMENT OF OSTEOARTHRITIS IN A SMALL JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.03.2017
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer Knee Creations, Inc.
900 Airport Road
Suite 3B
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
For all designated states
Hanson, Shaun B.
1585 Sundance Drive
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
For all designated states
Mandeen, Christopher D.
300 East Evans Street Apt. P-166
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
For all designated states
Carroll, Jamie A.
229 Flintlock Road
Drexel Hill, PA 19026 / US
For all designated states
Laporta, Guido
867 Goose Hill
Dalton, PA 18414 / US
[2014/34]
Inventor(s)01 / HANSON, Shaun, B.
1585 Sundance Drive
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
02 / MANDEEN, Christopher, D.
300 East Evans Street
Apt. P-166
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
03 / CARROLL, Jamie, A.
229 Flintlock Road
Drexel Hill, PA 19026 / US
04 / LAPORTA, Guido
867 Goose Hill
Dalton, PA 18414 / US
 [2014/34]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date12784120.311.10.2012
WO2012US59711
Priority number, dateUS201161545846P11.10.2011         Original published format: US 201161545846 P
[2014/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013055891
Date:18.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2765925
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.04.2013
[2014/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/17
[2014/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND INSTRUMENTE ZUR SUBCHONDRALEN BEHANDLUNG VON OSTEOARTHRITIS BEI KLEINEN GELENKEN[2014/34]
English:METHODS AND INSTRUMENTS FOR SUBCHONDRAL TREATMENT OF OSTEOARTHRITIS IN A SMALL JOINT[2014/34]
French:MÉTHODES ET INSTRUMENTS UTILISÉS POUR LE TRAITEMENT SOUS-CHONDRAL DE L'ARTHROSE DANS UNE PETITE ARTICULATION[2014/34]
Entry into regional phase08.05.2014National basic fee paid 
08.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
08.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
02.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.05.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.03.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2011063281  (KNEE CREATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 8,10-12 * figures 1,2A,7A,8,9,13A,13B * * page 11, lines 22-24 * * page 18, lines 11-28 * * page 19, lines 7-11 * * page 20, lines 15-20 * [Y] 13;
 [X]WO2011063257  (KNEE CREATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 8-12,14 * figures 4A-7 * * page 15, lines 25-27 * * page 17, line 7 - page 19, line 22 *;
 [X]WO2011063267  (KNEE CREATIONS LLC [US], et al) [X] 8,11,12,14 * figures 1A-2B,5A * * page 16, lines 17-28 * * page 19, lines 14-30 * * page 30, lines 9-12 *;
 [Y]WO2009158522  (SMALL BONE INNOVATIONS INC [US], et al) [Y] 13 * figure 3 * * page 66 *;
 [A]US2010160925  (HEILALA MATT A [US], et al) [A] 8 * the whole document *
by applicantUS8062364
 US2011125156
 US2011125157
 US2011125265
 US2011125264
 US2011125272