Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2806956

EP2806956 - PROCESS AND PLANT FOR DISTILLATION OF METHANOL WITH HEAT RECOVERY. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/49]PROCESS AND PLANT FOR DISTILLATION OF METHANOL WITH HEAT RECOVERY
[2016/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Casale SA
Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6
6900 Lugano-Besso / CH
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / FILIPPI, Ermanno
Strada di Gandria 73
CH-6976 Castagnola / CH
02 / OSTUNI, Raffaele
Via Montarina 21
6900 Lugano / CH
 [2015/47]
Former [2014/49]01 / FILIPPI, Ermanno
Strada di Gandria 73
CH-6976 Castagnola / CH
02 / OSTUNI, Raffaele
Viale E. Stefini 8
I-20125 Milano / IT
Representative(s)Zardi, Marco
M. Zardi & Co. SA
Via Pioda 6
6900 Lugano / CH
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date12784259.913.11.2012
[2016/38]
WO2012EP72443
Priority number, dateEP2012015218723.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12152187
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110369
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2806956
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2806956
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:B01D3/00, B01D3/14
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REKTIFIKATION VON METHANOL MIT WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG[2016/18]
English:PROCESS AND PLANT FOR DISTILLATION OF METHANOL WITH HEAT RECOVERY.[2016/18]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LA DISTILLATION DE MÉTHANOL AVEC RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR[2016/18]
Former [2014/49]VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR DESTILLATION VON METHANOL MIT WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG
Former [2014/49]PROCESS AND PLANT FOR DISTILLATION OF METHANOL WITH HEAT RECOVERY
Former [2014/49]PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION DE DISTILLATION DE MÉTHANOL AVEC RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR
Entry into regional phase28.07.2014National basic fee paid 
28.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
20.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2016Fee for grant paid
08.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2016
Opposition(s)22.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.11.2012
AL21.09.2016
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
TR21.09.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU13.11.2012
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
TR21.09.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2018/43]HU13.11.2012
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
IE13.11.2016
MT13.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2018/30]HU13.11.2012
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
HR21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
MK21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
IE13.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
IE13.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/43]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/35]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
ES21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
IT21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/23]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
BE30.11.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT21.09.2016
Cited inInternational search[XD]US4210495  (PINTO ALWYN [GB]) [XD] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 2, line 10 - line 30 * * column 6, line 1 - line 12 * * column 6, line 50 - line 64 *;
 [A]US4592806  (ILGNER HARTMUT [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 36 *;
 [A]EP0210888  (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 14, line 9 - line 33 *;
 [A]US2008135396  (BLUM STEPHAN RUDIGER [CA]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 35 - page 3, paragraph 54 *
by applicantUS4210495
 US4592806