Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2772039

EP2772039 - NETWORK-ASSISTED PEER-TO-PEER SECURE COMMUNICATION ESTABLISHMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALCATEL LUCENT
148/152 route de la Reine
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2014/36]
Inventor(s)01 / BROUSTIS, Loannis
163 Main Street
Apartment 3b
Millburn, NJ 07041 / US
02 / SUNDARAM, Ganapathy, S.
10 Hickory Road
Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Hirsch & Associés
137, rue de l'Université
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/36]Hirsch & Associés
58, avenue Marceau
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12784811.722.10.2012
WO2012US61325
Priority number, dateUS20111328313327.10.2011         Original published format: US201113283133
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013062911
Date:02.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2772039
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2013
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/08
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/36]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG EINER NETZWERKGESTÜTZTEN SICHEREN PEER-TO-PEER-KOMMUNIKATION[2014/36]
English:NETWORK-ASSISTED PEER-TO-PEER SECURE COMMUNICATION ESTABLISHMENT[2014/36]
French:ETABLISSEMENT DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATIONS SÉCURISÉES ENTRE HOMOLOGUES ASSISTÉES PAR UN RÉSEAU[2014/36]
Entry into regional phase13.05.2014National basic fee paid 
13.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
13.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
28.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/41]
31.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201504   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2009288138  (KALOFONOS DIMITRIS [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0053]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0074]; figure 6 *;
 [A]US2011055567  (SUNDARAM GANAPATHY S [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0078] *
by applicantUS7904715
    - T. DIERKS; E. RESCORLA, "The Transport Layer Security (TLS) Protocol Version 1.2", IETF RFC, page 5246,
    - J. ARKKO ET AL., "Extensible Authentication Protocol for 3rd Generation Authentication and Key Agreement (EAP-AKA", IETF RFC 4187,
    - A. BRUSILOVSKY ET AL., "Password-Authenticated Key (PAK) Diffie-Hel1man Exchange", IETF RFC 5683,
    - V. CAKULEV; G. SUNDARAM, "IBAKE: Identity-Based Authenticated Key Agreement", IETF INTERNET-DRAFT, (20110420),
    - J. FRANKS ET AL., "HTTP Authentication: Basic and Digest Access Authentication", IETF RFC 2619,
    - R. FIELDING ET AL., "Hypertext Transfer Protocol - HTTP/1.1", IETF RFC 2616,
    - J. C. SNADER, Effective TCP/IP Programming: 44 Tips to Improve Your Network Programs, ADDISON-WESLEY PROFESSIONAL,
    - Z. SHELBY ET AL., "Constrained Application Protocol (CoAP", DRAFT-IETF-CORE-COAP-02,
    - M. HARTL, "Ruby on Rails Tutorial", LEARN REST: A TUTORIAL,
    - H. SCHULZRINNE ET AL., "RTP Profile for Audio and Video Conferences with Minimal Control", IETF RFC 3551,
    - P. HETHMON, "Extensions to FTP", IETF RFC 3659,
    - J. GALBRAITH, "SSH File Transfer Protocol", IETF DRAFT 2006,
    - M. BAUGHER ET AL., "The Secure Real-time Transport Protocol (SRTP", IETF RFC 3711,
    - X. BOYEN ET AL., "Identity-Based Cryptography Standard (1BCS) #1: Supcrsingular Curve Implcmcntations of the BF and BB1 Cryptosystems", IETF RFC 5091, (200712),
    - "3GPP Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects", IP MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM (IMS, (201101),
    - M. J. DONAHOO, TCP/IP Sockets in C: Practical Guide for Programmers,
    - D. BONEH ET AL., "Identity-Based Encryption from the Weil Pairing", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - PROCEEDINGS OFCRYPTO, (2001),
 US20090372242
 US20100549907