Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2710578 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2710578



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 423
07.05.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.03.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
20.03.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.03.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
25.02.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
25.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.02.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.2019 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
21.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.01.2019 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.10.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.10.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 37
25.10.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 37
22.10.2018 Annex to a communication Search / examination 6
22.10.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
22.10.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.10.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.10.2018 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.10.2018 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
08.10.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
08.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.10.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
27.09.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
27.09.2018 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
27.09.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
07.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 5
07.09.2018 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 13
27.02.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
23.02.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.02.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.02.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
20.02.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.02.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
06.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.12.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
06.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
06.12.2017 Description Search / examination 5
06.12.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.09.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
26.09.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
26.09.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
26.09.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
24.04.2017 Description Search / examination 2
24.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
14.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 10
14.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.09.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.09.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
05.09.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
29.04.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
29.04.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.04.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.10.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.10.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
19.10.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.10.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
09.04.2015 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 9
20.03.2015 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 4
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
17.11.2014 Partial European search report Search / examination 6
03.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
04.07.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.02.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.01.2014 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
20.12.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.12.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
05.12.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
05.12.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
05.12.2013 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.12.2013 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
27.09.2013 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
12.12.2012 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 37
22.11.2012 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
22.11.2012 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 35