Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2727440

EP2727440 - DETERMINE A SETTING OF A TRIAC DIMMER THROUGH INDUCED RELAXATION OSCILLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lumenpulse Lighting Inc.
1220 Marie-Victorin Blvd.
Longueuil, QC J4G 2H9 / CA
[2018/42]
Former [2014/19]For all designated states
Lumenpulse Lighting Inc.
1751 Rue Richardson Suite 1505
Montreal, QC H3K 1G6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / CAMPBELL, Gregory
17 Joal Avenue
Walpole, MA 02081 / US
02 / ISSA, Jerome
17 Elliot Street
Norwood, MA 02062 / US
03 / DIBARTOLO, Joseph, Michael
181 D Street Apartment 3
South Boston, MA 02127 / US
 [2014/19]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/21]Murphy, Colm Damien
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2014/19]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Ipulse
126-130 Regent Street
London W1B 5SE / GB
Application number, filing date12785781.111.05.2012
WO2012US37424
Priority number, dateUS201161485910P13.05.2011         Original published format: US 201161485910 P
US20121334620009.01.2012         Original published format: US201213346200
[2014/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012158480
Date:22.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/47]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2727440
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2012
[2014/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR17.01.2013
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:H05B41/38, H05B37/02, H05B33/08, H05B39/08, H05B41/392
[2015/11]
Former International [2014/19]H05B41/38, H05B37/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/19]
TitleGerman:BESTIMMUNG EINER EINSTELLUNG EINES TRIAC-DIMMERS DURCH INDUZIERTE RELAXATIONSSCHWINGUNG[2014/19]
English:DETERMINE A SETTING OF A TRIAC DIMMER THROUGH INDUCED RELAXATION OSCILLATION[2014/19]
French:DÉTERMINATION D'UN RÉGLAGE D'UN GRADATEUR À TRIAC PAR OSCILLATION DE RELAXATION INDUITE[2014/19]
Entry into regional phase20.12.2012National basic fee paid 
20.12.2012Search fee paid 
20.12.2012Designation fee(s) paid 
20.12.2012Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.12.2012Examination requested  [2014/19]
26.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2018
27.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/07]
03.10.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/07]
04.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.03.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2011084622  (BARROW STEVEN M [US] ET AL) [X] 5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0029]; figures 4A,4B,11 * [Y] 1-4,6-13;
 [Y]WO2009120555  (ASIC ADVANTAGE INC [US]; IRISSOU PIERRE [US]; COLMET-DAAGE ETIENNE [US) [Y] 1-13 * paragraphs [0027] , [0057] , [0075] , [0 77]; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [Y]US2011043133  (VAN LAANEN PETER [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-13 * figures 10,14 *;
 [Y]US6229271  (LIU GUANG [US]) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1,5 *;
 [Y]US2010090618  (VELTMAN ANDRE [NL] VELTMAN ANDRÉ [NL]) [Y] 1-13 * figures 3,8 *;
 [Y]WO2011042510  (LEMNIS LIGHTING PATENT HOLDING B V [NL]; VELTMAN ANDRE [NL]) [Y] 1-13 * figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US2005253533  (LYS IHOR A [US] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * figure 4 *
International search[A]WO2011016720  (ELDOLAB HOLDING B.V. ET AL.);
 [A]US7791326  (DAHLMAN MARK COBB ET AL.);
 [A]US7271550  (JAMES ROBERT VANDERZON);
 [A]US7358679  (IHOR A. LYS ET AL.)
by applicantUS2011084622
 WO2008112735