EP2867211 - METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF MEDETOMIDINE WITH CHLOROACETONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza Ltd Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH | [2015/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZARAGOZA DOERWALD, Florencio Bäretstrasse 2 CH-3930 Visp / CH | 02 /
KULESZA, Anna Eggustrasse CH-3938 Ausserberg / CH | 03 /
ELZNER, Stephan Apollostrasse 6 CH-3902 Brig-Glis / CH | 04 /
BUJOK, Robert Sokolowska 6m. 34 PL-01-136 Warszawa / PL | 05 /
WROBEL, Zbigniew Zwiazku Walki Mlodych 16m. 26 PL-02-786 Warszawa / PL | 06 /
WOJCIECHOWSKI, Krzysztof Gubinowska 7m. 148 PL-02-956 Warszawa / PL | [2015/19] | Application number, filing date | 12787007.9 | 15.11.2012 | [2016/01] | WO2012EP72798 | Priority number, date | EP20120174102 | 28.06.2012 Original published format: EP 12174102 | US201261665510P | 28.06.2012 Original published format: US 201261665510 P | EP20120188104 | 11.10.2012 Original published format: EP 12188104 | WO2012EP70875 | 22.10.2012 Original published format: PCT/EP2012/070875 | EP20120192625 | 14.11.2012 Original published format: EP 12192625 | [2015/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013011157 | Date: | 24.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2867211 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.01.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2867211 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D233/56, A61K31/4164 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
C07D233/58 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/4164 (KR);
C07D233/56 (EP,KR,US);
C07D263/16 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON MEDETOMIDIN MIT CHLORACETON | [2015/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARATION OF MEDETOMIDINE WITH CHLOROACETONE | [2015/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MÉDÉTOMIDINE À PARTIR DE CHLORO-ACÉTONE | [2015/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/19] | 01.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 30.12.2015 | BG | 30.12.2015 | EE | 30.12.2015 | LT | 30.12.2015 | LV | 30.12.2015 | MC | 30.12.2015 | MK | 30.12.2015 | RS | 30.12.2015 | SI | 30.12.2015 | SK | 30.12.2015 | SM | 30.12.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 30.12.2015 | |
EE | 30.12.2015 | ||
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
MC | 30.12.2015 | ||
MK | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/16] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SI | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
SM | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 30.12.2015 | |
LT | 30.12.2015 | ||
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
SK | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
LV | 30.12.2015 | ||
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 30.12.2015 | |
RS | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 30.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1918282 (GRINDEKS JSC [LV]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0027]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2011070069 (TECH AB I [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 7 - line 12 * * example 1 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [AD] - CORDI A A ET AL, "EFFICIENT SYNTHESIS OF (S)-4(5)-Ä1-(2,3-DIMETHYLPHENYL)ETHYLÜIMIDAZOLE TARTRATE, THE POTENT ALPHA2 ADRENOCEPTOR AGONIST DEXMEDETOMIDINE", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, TAYLOR & FRANCIS GROUP, PHILADELPHIA, PA, (19960101), vol. 26, no. 8, doi:10.1080/00397919608003527, ISSN 0039-7911, pages 1585 - 1593, XP009014489 [AD] 1-13 * page 1587 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919608003527 | by applicant | US2010048915 | WO0042851 | - CORDI ET AL., SYNTH. COMMUN., (1996), vol. 26, pages 1585 - 1593 |