Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2904048

EP2904048 - SUSTAINABLE ISOSORBIDE - CONTAINING POLYCARBONATE - POLYLACTIDE BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.05.2017  [2017/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/33]For all designated states
SABIC Global Technologies B.V.
Plasticslaan 1
4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
Inventor(s)01 / JUIKAR, Vishvajit Chandrakant
John F Welch Technology Centre Export Promotion
Industrial Park
Phase 2 Hoodi Village
Whitefield Road
Bangalore Karnataka 560066 / IN
02 / KUMAR, B. Vinay
John F. Welch Technology Centre Export Promotion
Industrial Park
Phase 2 Hoodi Village
Whitefield Road
Bangalore Karnataka 560066 / IN
03 / VAN DE GRAMPEL, Robert Dirk
Plasticslaan 1
NL-4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL
 [2015/33]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2015/33]
Application number, filing date12787102.804.10.2012
[2015/33]
WO2012IB55318
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2014053878
Date:10.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2904048
Date:12.08.2015
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2014
[2015/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:C08L51/04, C08L55/02, C08L67/04, C08L69/00
[2015/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
TitleGerman:NACHHALTIGE ISOSORBIDHALTIGE POLYCARBONAT-POLYLACTID-MISCHUNGEN[2015/33]
English:SUSTAINABLE ISOSORBIDE - CONTAINING POLYCARBONATE - POLYLACTIDE BLENDS[2015/33]
French:MÉLANGES DE POLYLACTIDE-POLYCARBONATE CONTENANT UN ISOSORBIDE RENOUVELABLE[2015/33]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2015National basic fee paid 
23.04.2015Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2015Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
01.12.2015Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
13.01.2016Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
26.09.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
07.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/20]
11.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/20]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.09.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2149589  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0090]; example 8; claims 1, 11; table 1 *;
 [A]EP2060606  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-27 * examples 1, 2; claims 1, 4 *;
 [A]US2012184651  (HURST JEREMY DAVID [NL], et al) [A] 1-27 * examples 1-9; claims 1, 2, 8; table 1a *;
 [A]EP1640400  (TEIJIN LTD [JP]) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0042]; claim 1 *
by applicantUS7112644
 US3516968
 US7244804
 US2011160422