Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783530

EP2783530 - REDUCTION OF THE AMOUNT OF REPORTING DONE TO A MANAGEMENT NODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Refusal of applicationpublished on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / LOBORG, Peter
G:a Kalmarvägen 68A
S-585 98 Linköping / SE
02 / GUNNARSSON, Fredrik
Tinnerbäcksgränd 28
S-587 50 Linköping / SE
03 / PETERSEN, Robert
Majgatan 5
S-582 46 Linköping / SE
04 / GROS, Lars Göran
Gripgatan 5b
S-582 43 Linköping / SE
05 / ENGSTRÖM, Stefan
Vårbruksgatan 69
S-583 32 Linköping / SE
06 / HASSETT, Brendan
Ballindrimna
Gurtymadden
Loughrea Galway / IE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB
Patent Unit Kista RAN 1
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12787140.808.10.2012
WO2012SE51074
Priority number, dateUS201161555692P04.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161555692 P
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013066241
Date:10.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783530
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/10
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:REDUZIERUNG DER ANZAHL VON MELDUNGEN AN EINEN VERWALTUNGSKNOTEN[2014/40]
English:REDUCTION OF THE AMOUNT OF REPORTING DONE TO A MANAGEMENT NODE[2014/40]
French:RÉDUCTION DE LA QUANTITÉ DE REPORTING FAIT À UN NOEUD DE GESTION[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/40]
22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
12.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/47]
18.06.2018Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.12.2016
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.06.2017Request for further processing filed
20.06.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.06.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
22.07.2014Request for further processing filed
22.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
ES, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
22.07.2014Request for further processing filed
22.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.09.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
22.07.2014Request for further processing filed
22.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.09.2014Decision despatched
22.07.2014Request for further processing filed
22.07.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
01.09.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XYI]WO2009072941  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]; PUCAR RIMHAGEN ANNA [SE]; WESTERBERG ERI) [X] 1,3-7,9-14,16-19,22,23 * abstract * * page 1, line 20 - page 6, line 10 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 21 * * figure 3 * [Y] 15 [I] 2,8,20,21,24,25;
 [XYI]WO2011095081  (ZTE CORP [CN]; SHI LIRONG [CN]) [X] 1,3-7,9-19,22,23 * abstract * [Y] 15 [I] 2,8,20,21,24,25;
 EP2509353  [ ] (ZTE CORP [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0033] *;
 [X]WO2009022805  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]; KIM YUNG MI [KR]; LEE YOUNG DAE [KR]; CHUN SU) [X] 1,7,19,22,23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] - [0055] *