Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2791065

EP2791065 - TREATMENT OF SURFACTANT LADEN WASTEWATER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BL Technologies, Inc.
5951 Clearwater Drive
Minnetonka, MN 55341 / US
[2019/04]
Former [2014/43]For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VASCONCELLOS, Stephen, Robert
Ge Water Process Technologies
4636 Somerton Road
Trevose, PA 19053 / US
02 / MERSCH, Matthew, D.
Ge Appliances&Lighting
Appliance Park
Louisville, KY 40225 / US
03 / POLLETT, James, Quentin
Ge Appliances&Lighting
Appliance Park
Louisville, KY 40225 / US
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Fonquernie, Sophie Benedicte , et al
Marks & Clerk France
Immeuble Visium
22, avenue Aristide Briand
94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Szary, Anne Catherine
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date12787323.007.11.2012
WO2012US63849
Priority number, dateUS20111332639615.12.2011         Original published format: US201113326396
[2014/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013089945
Date:20.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2791065
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/56
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON MIT TENSIDEN GELADENEM ABWASSER[2014/43]
English:TREATMENT OF SURFACTANT LADEN WASTEWATER[2014/43]
French:TRAITEMENT D'EAUX USÉES CHARGÉES EN TENSIOACTIFS[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase15.07.2014National basic fee paid 
15.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
15.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
29.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.12.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.07.2018
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.02.2019Request for further processing filed
11.02.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.02.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[IY]US2011297622  (SURESH SEETHALAKSHMI [IN] ET AL) [I] 1,4-9 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0014] , [0015] , [0017] , [0038] , [0039] , [0040] , [0041] * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]DE19544455  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * page 2, line 56 - page 3, line 64 *;
 [A]EP0074776  (BETZ EUROP INC [US]) [A] 4 * page 5, line 21 - line 27 *
 [XYI]  - WANG J P ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of a novel cationic chitosan-based flocculant with a high water-solubility for pulp mill wastewater treatment", WATER RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 43, no. 20, ISSN 0043-1354, (20091201), pages 5267 - 5275, (20090902), XP026790182 [X] 1 * page 5267 * * page 5269, paragraph 2.3; figure 1 * * page 5274, paragraph 4. * [Y] 2,3 [I] 4-9