EP2783107 - A WIND TURBINE BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LM Wind Power International Technology II ApS Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | [2018/39] |
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states LM WP Patent Holding A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Ashish House No. 111 5th C Cross Kasturi Nagar Bangalore 560043 / IN | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | COPA Copenhagen Patents Rosenørns Allé 1, 2nd floor 1970 Frederiksberg C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2018/40] | Kitchen, Steven Richard, et al LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | ||
Former [2014/40] | Hussey, Paul Anthony LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | Application number, filing date | 12787440.2 | 15.11.2012 | [2018/40] | WO2012EP72768 | Priority number, date | EP20110190374 | 23.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11190374 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013076008 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2783107 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2783107 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D7/04, F03D80/00, F03D1/06, F03D3/06 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
F03D1/0608 (EP,US);
F03D7/022 (US);
F03D1/0633 (EP,US);
F03D1/0641 (US);
F03D1/065 (EP,US);
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
F03D3/061 (EP,US);
F03D7/04 (US);
F03D80/00 (EP,US);
F05B2250/183 (EP,US);
F05B2260/96 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y02E10/74 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/40] | F03D3/06, F03D11/00, F03D1/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WINDTURBINENSCHAUFEL | [2014/40] | English: | A WIND TURBINE BLADE | [2014/40] | French: | PALE DE TURBINE D'ÉOLIENNE | [2018/16] |
Former [2014/40] | PALE DE TURBINE ÉOLIENNE | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 17.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.11.2012 | AL | 03.10.2018 | AT | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | CZ | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | FI | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | IT | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | NL | 03.10.2018 | PL | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SE | 03.10.2018 | SI | 03.10.2018 | SK | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | TR | 03.10.2018 | LU | 15.11.2018 | MT | 15.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | PT | 03.02.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.11.2012 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
TR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
MT | 15.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SI | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SK | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
IT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
LU | 15.11.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
AT | 03.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
PT | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
SE | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 03.10.2018 | |
CZ | 03.10.2018 | ||
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 03.10.2018 | |
FI | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
PL | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NL | 03.10.2018 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 03.10.2018 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1674723 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-5; claims 1,4,7-9 * [A] 3; | [YA]EP1780408 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0019]; figures 1-5; claims 1-4,6 *[A] 3; | [YA]WO2009025549 (STICHTING ENERGIE [NL], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * page 9, line 7 - page 11, line 33; figures 1-4; claims 1-8, 19,20 * [A] 3; | [YA]WO2009025548 (STICHTING ENERGIE [NL], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-15 * column 9, line 22 - column 14, line 3; figures 1-5; claims 1-5 * [A] 3; | [YDA]US2011142666 (DROBIETZ ROGER [DE], et al) [YD] 1,2,4-15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [A] 3 | by applicant | US2008166241 | US2011142666 |