Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810480

EP2810480 - INTER-FREQUENCY AND INTER-RAT SMALL CELL DETECTION IN HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[2016/13]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / TEYEB, Oumer
C/O Croneborg
Upplandsgatan 44
2 tr
SE-113 28 Stockholm / SE
02 / MILDH, Gunnar
Koltrastvägen 28
SE-192 55 Sollentuna / SE
03 / FOLKE, Mats
Professorsvägen 122 B
SE-977 51 Luleå / SE
04 / WIEMANN, Henning
Kelmesbergweg 7
DE-52080 Aachen / DE
05 / WAGER, Stefan
Övergårdsvägen 41 D
FIN-02360 Espoo / FI
 [2014/50]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/50]Bruce, Alexander Richard Henry
Ericsson Limited
Patent Unit UK
Unit 4 Midleton Gate
Guildford Business Park
Guildford GU2 8SG / GB
Application number, filing date12787534.219.10.2012
[2016/13]
WO2012SE51123
Priority number, dateUS201261592255P30.01.2012         Original published format: US 201261592255 P
[2014/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013115696
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2810480
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810480
Date:30.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00, // H04W24/10, H04W36/04, H04W84/04, H04W36/30
[2015/41]
Former International [2014/50]H04W36/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:INTERFREQUENZ- UND INTER-RAT-DETEKTION KLEINER ZELLEN IN HETEROGENEN NETZWERKEN[2014/50]
English:INTER-FREQUENCY AND INTER-RAT SMALL CELL DETECTION IN HETEROGENEOUS NETWORKS[2014/50]
French:DÉTECTION DE PETITES CELLULES INTER-RAT ET INTER-FRÉQUENCE DANS DES RÉSEAUX HÉTÉROGÈNES[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2014National basic fee paid 
25.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
21.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
12.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.01.2016Fee for grant paid
26.01.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.10.2015
Opposition(s)03.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10]
Request for further processing for:12.06.2015Request for further processing filed
12.06.2015Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.06.2015Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.10.2012
AL30.03.2016
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
TR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.10.2016
LU19.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU19.10.2012
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
TR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.10.2016
LU19.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/38]HU19.10.2012
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
BG30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.10.2016
LU19.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/31]HU19.10.2012
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.10.2016
LU19.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
Former [2018/30]HU19.10.2012
AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CY30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
MC30.03.2016
MK30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.10.2016
LU19.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/51]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
IE19.10.2016
LU19.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/43]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
LU19.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/37]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SI30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
Former [2017/07]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
DK30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT30.03.2016
BE30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
IT30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
PT01.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT30.03.2016
CZ30.03.2016
EE30.03.2016
ES30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RO30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
SK30.03.2016
SM30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/49]EE30.03.2016
FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
PL30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/48]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
IS30.07.2016
Former [2016/44]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
NL30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/39]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
LV30.03.2016
RS30.03.2016
SE30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/36]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
LT30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Former [2016/35]FI30.03.2016
HR30.03.2016
NO30.06.2016
GR01.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]  - VODAFONE, "Small Cell Discovery for Traffic Offloading", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-114009, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20110815), vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20110822, XP050539685 [Y] 1,2,6-12,16-21 * page 1, lines 19-21, 25-26 * * page 2, lines 9-14 *
 [Y]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol specification (Release 10)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.331, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111220), vol. RAN WG2, no. V10.4.0, pages 1 - 296, XP050555028 [Y] 1,2,6-12,16-21 * paragraph 5.5.1 * * paragraph 5.5.2 * * paragraph 5.5.3 * * paragraph 5.5.4 * * paragraph 5.5.4.3 * * paragraph 5.5.3.1 *
 [A]  - POTEVIO, "Consideration on small cell discovery in HetNet", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-115821, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111106), vol. RAN WG2, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050564017 [A] 1-21 * paragraph 2.1 *
 [A]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Mobility Enhancements in Heterogeneous Networks (Release 11)", 3GPP DRAFT; TR-36839-040, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120107), XP050563543 [A] 1-21 * paragraph 4 * * paragraph 6 *
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111220), vol. RAN WG2, no. V11.0.0, pages 1 - 194, XP050555023 [A] 1-21 * paragraph 10.1.2 * * paragraph 10.1.3 * * paragraph 10.2.3 * * paragraph 10.5 *
 [XP]  - ERICSSON ET AL, "Detection of small cells in HetNets", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-120467 DETECTION OF SMALL CELLS IN HETNETS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120131), vol. RAN WG2, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050565403 [XP] 1-21 * the whole document *
by applicant   - "Radio Resource Control (RRC) Protocol", 3GPP TS 36.331