Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2758965


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
11.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.11.2019  [2019/46]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
25.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
11.05.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.06.2018  [2018/24]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
20.04.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.05.2018  [2018/21]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
16.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.03.2018  [2018/12]
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.06.2017 (Expected) grant published on  05.07.2017  [2017/27]
26.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
26.05.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
10.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
27.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.02.2017 Change - classification published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
17.02.2017 Change - classification published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
04.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
01.04.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.03.2016 First examination report
02.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2014 Change - extension states published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
19.09.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
27.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
23.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
08.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
04.04.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
29.03.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
27.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication