Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2758965

EP2758965 - DUAL FLUID REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huke, Armin
Tegernauer Zeile 1
13469 Berlin / DE
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / HUKE, Armin
Tegernauer Zeile 1
13469 Berlin / DE
02 / RUPRECHT, Götz
Leistikowstrasse 2
14050 Berlin / DE
03 / HUSSEIN, Ahmed
8635 Heather Street
Vancouver V6P 3S6 / CA
04 / CZERSKI, Konrad
Uhlandstrasse 46
10719 Berlin / DE
05 / GOTTLIEB, Stefan
Westenderweg 110
58313 Herdecke / DE
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Baumbach, Friedrich
Patentanwalt
Robert-Rössle-Strasse 10
13125 Berlin / DE
[2014/31]
Application number, filing date12787633.221.09.2012
[2017/27]
WO2012DE00957
Priority number, dateDE20111011434221.09.2011         Original published format: DE102011114342
DE2012100793317.04.2012         Original published format: DE102012007933
[2014/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013041085
Date:28.03.2013
Language:DE
[2013/13]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2758965
Date:30.07.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2013
[2014/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2758965
Date:05.07.2017
Language:DE
[2017/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G21C1/02, G21C1/22, G21C3/44, G21C3/54, G21C15/02, G21C15/28, G21C19/307, G21D5/08, G21C1/32, G21C15/24, // G21C15/247
[2017/12]
Former International [2014/31]G21C1/02, G21C1/22, G21C3/44, G21C3/54, G21C15/02, G21C15/28, G21C19/307, G21D5/08, G21C1/32
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DUAL FLUID REAKTOR[2014/31]
English:DUAL FLUID REACTOR[2014/31]
French:RÉACTEUR À FLUIDE DOUBLE[2014/31]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
08.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
23.05.2017Fee for grant paid
23.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2016
Opposition(s)06.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
MT05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
IE21.09.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/39]DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SI05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
IE21.09.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/35]DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
IE21.09.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/26]DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
IT05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
MC05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
SM05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/23]DK05.07.2017
EE05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
RO05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/21]DK05.07.2017
ES05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/12]ES05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
LV05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Former [2018/11]ES05.07.2017
HR05.07.2017
RS05.07.2017
BG05.10.2017
GR06.10.2017
IS05.11.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]US3251745  (TEITEL ROBERT J) [X] 1,3-10,18 * column 8, line 7 - column 10, line 4; figures 3,5,8,11,12,15 * * column 14, lines 49-66 * * column 6, line 56 * * column 9, lines 65-71 * * column 4, lines 7-54 * * column 12, lines 50-68 * [Y] 2;
 [XA]JP2001133572  (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 18 * abstract * [A] 1-10;
 [YA]DE1807986  (EURATOM) [Y] 2 * page 10, line 15 - page 11, line 23; figures 1-3 * [A] 1,3-10,18