Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2825995

EP2825995 - SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFICATION OF A DIGITAL CAMERA STARTING FROM A PICTURE AND METHOD IMPLEMENTED WITH SAID SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/04]SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING THE IDENTIFICATION OF A PHOTOGRAPHIC APPARATUS ON THE BASIS OF A PHOTOGRAPH AND METHOD IMPLEMENTED IN SUCH A SYSTEM
[2016/50]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2017(Expected) grantpublished on 15.03.2017  [2017/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université de Technologie de Troyes
12, rue Marie Curie
10010 Troyes Cedex / FR
[2017/11]
Former [2015/04]For all designated states
Université de Technologie de Troyes
12 rue Marie Curie
10010 Troyes Cedex / FR
Inventor(s)01 / RETRAINT, Florent
7 rue Herlucot
10270 Courteranges / FR
02 / COGRANNE, Rémi
46 voie Gillier
10130 Chamoy / FR
 [2015/04]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[2017/11]
Former [2015/04]Thomas, Nadine
Cabinet Blétry & Associés
82 Boulevard de Sébastopol
75003 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12787770.216.10.2012
[2017/11]
WO2012FR52357
Priority number, dateFR2012005220912.03.2012         Original published format: FR 1252209
[2015/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013135977
Date:19.09.2013
Language:FR
[2013/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2825995
Date:21.01.2015
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013
[2015/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2825995
Date:15.03.2017
Language:FR
[2017/11]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP19.09.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06K9/00
[2015/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER DIGITALKAMERA VON EINEM BILD UND ENTSPRECHENDE DURCHFÜHRUNG VERFAHREN[2016/50]
English:SYSTEM FOR IDENTIFICATION OF A DIGITAL CAMERA STARTING FROM A PICTURE AND METHOD IMPLEMENTED WITH SAID SYSTEM[2016/50]
French:SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER L'IDENTIFICATION D'UN APPAREIL PHOTOGRAPHIQUE A PARTIR D'UNE PHOTOGRAPHIE ET PROCÉDÉ MIS EN OEUVRE DANS UN TEL SYSTÈME[2015/04]
Former [2015/04]SYSTEM ZUR ERMITTLUNG DER KENNUNG EINER PHOTOGRAPHISCHEN VORRICHTUNG AUF BASIS EINES FOTOS UND IN EINEM SOLCHEN SYSTEM DURCHGEFÜHRTES VERFAHREN
Former [2015/04]SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING THE IDENTIFICATION OF A PHOTOGRAPHIC APPARATUS ON THE BASIS OF A PHOTOGRAPH AND METHOD IMPLEMENTED IN SUCH A SYSTEM
Entry into regional phase10.09.2014National basic fee paid 
10.09.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2014Examination requested  [2015/04]
15.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2017Fee for grant paid
30.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]  - CHEN M ET AL, "Determining Image Origin and Integrity Using Sensor Noise", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION FORENSICS AND SECURITY, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080301), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1556-6013, pages 74 - 90, XP011204150 [I] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - TRAN VAN LANH ET AL, "A Survey on Digital Camera Image Forensic Methods", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2007 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20070701), ISBN 978-1-4244-1016-3, pages 16 - 19, XP031123550 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - FOI A ET AL, "Practical Poissonian-Gaussian Noise Modeling and Fitting for Single-Image Raw-Data", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20081001), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 1737 - 1754, XP011248121 [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - M. GOLJAN, "Large Scale Test of Sensor Fingerprint Camera Identification", SPIE-IS&T, MEDIA FORENSICS AND SECURITY, (2009), vol. 7254, pages 72540I-1 - *-12, XP002692615 [A] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.805701
 [DA]  - LUKAS, J.; FRIDRICH, J.; GOLJAN, M., "Digital camera identification from sensor pattern noise", INFORMATION FORENSICS AND SECURITY, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON, (200606), vol. 1, no. 2, pages 205 - 214, XP002694371 [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIFS.2010.2046268
 [DA]  - HEALEY, G.E.; KONDEPUDY, R, "Radiometric CCD camera calibration and noise estimation", IEEE TRANSACTION ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1994), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 267 - 276, XP002694372 [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.276126
by applicant   - LUKAS, J.; FRIDRICH, J.; GOLJAN, M., "Digital camera identification from sensor pattern noise", INFORMATION FORENSICS AND SECURITY, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON, (200606), vol. 1, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/TIFS.2010.2046268, pages 205 - 214, XP002694371

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIFS.2010.2046268
    - CHEN, M.; FRIDRICH, J.; GOLJAN, M.; LUKAS, J., "Determining Image Origin and Integrity Using Sensor Noise", INFORMATION FORENSICS AND SECURITY, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON, (200803), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 74 - 90, XP011204150
    - M. KHARRAZI; H. T. SENCAR; N. MEMON, "Image Steganography : Concept and Practice", LECTURE NOTES SERIES, INSTITUTE FOR MATHEMATICAL SCIENCES, (2004),
    - HEALEY, G.E.; KONDEPUDY, R, "Radiometric CCD camera calibration and noise estimation", IEEE TRANSACTION ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (1994), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/34.276126, pages 267 - 276, XP002694372

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.276126
    - FOI, A.; TRIMECHE, M.; KATKOVNIK, V.; EGIAZARIAN, K., "Practical Poissonian-Gaussian Noise Modeling and Fitting for Single-Image Raw-Data", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, (200810), vol. 17, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1109/TIP.2008.2001399, pages 1737 - 1754, XP011234201

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIP.2008.2001399
    - MAILLARD, J.-B.; LEVESQUE, D.; DESCHENES, F., "Detection of digital processing of images through a realistic model of CCD noise", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, ICPR, (20081208),
    - SHAO, J., "Asymptotic distribution of the weighted least squares estimator", ANNALS OF THE INSTITUTE OF STATISTICAL MATHEMATICS, (1989), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 365 - 382,
    - LEHMANN, E.L.; ROMANO, J.P, Testing Statistical Hypotheses, SPINGER,
    - M. KHARRAZI; H. T. SENCAR; N. MEMON, "Image Steganography : Concept and Practice", LECTURE NOTES SERIES, INSTITUTE FOR MATHEMATICAL SCIENCES, NATIONAL UNIVERSITY OF SINGAPORE, (2004),