Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2790843

EP2790843 - MAIL SORTING MACHINE FOR FLAT OBJECTS, HAVING A SEPARATING FLAP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solystic
152-160 avenue Aristide Briand
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / DE SOUSA, Olivier
Les Veyriers
F-26120 Montmeyran / FR
02 / DELBE, Emmanuel
524 rue André Malraux
F-07500 Guilherand Granges / FR
03 / BERLIET, Damien
55 rue du Rhône
F-26500 Bourg Les Valence / FR
04 / AGIER, François
361 route des Chanalets
F-26500 Bourg Les Valence / FR
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date12787806.423.10.2012
[2015/38]
WO2012FR52424
Priority number, dateFR2011006156013.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1161560
[2014/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013088008
Date:20.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2790843
Date:22.10.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.06.2013
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2790843
Date:16.09.2015
Language:FR
[2015/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:B07C3/06, B65H29/58
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:POSTSORTIERMASCHINE FÜR FLACHE GEGENSTÄNDE MIT EINER TRENNUNGSKLAPPE[2014/43]
English:MAIL SORTING MACHINE FOR FLAT OBJECTS, HAVING A SEPARATING FLAP[2014/43]
French:MACHINE DE TRI POSTAL POUR OBJETS PLATS AVEC VOLET DE SÉPARATION[2014/43]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2014National basic fee paid 
14.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/43]
06.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2015Fee for grant paid
05.08.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.08.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.07.2015
Opposition(s)17.06.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.10.2012
AL16.09.2015
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
IE23.10.2015
LU23.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU23.10.2012
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
TR16.09.2015
IE23.10.2015
LU23.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2018/31]HU23.10.2012
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MK16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
IE23.10.2015
LU23.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2018/02]HU23.10.2012
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
IE23.10.2015
LU23.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2017/39]HU23.10.2012
BG16.09.2015
CY16.09.2015
CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
MT16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
SM16.09.2015
IE23.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SI16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
IE23.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/45]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
IE23.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/28]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
MC16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/24]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
PL16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
PT18.01.2016
Former [2016/23]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
RO16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
SK16.09.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/22]CZ16.09.2015
EE16.09.2015
ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
GR17.12.2015
IS16.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES16.09.2015
HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/10]HR16.09.2015
LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
RS16.09.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/09]LT16.09.2015
LV16.09.2015
GR17.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT16.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]EP2206564  (ELSAG DATAMAT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9810876  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure - *;
 [A]JPS5948352  (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-10 * figure - *
by applicantUS6533271
 US2011203903