blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2786235 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2786235



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 173
11.03.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.05.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
10.04.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.03.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.03.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.03.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
17.02.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
17.02.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
17.02.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
17.02.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
28.01.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
10.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.07.2014 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
11.07.2014 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
09.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
12.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 10
01.04.2014 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
21.02.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 5
21.02.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
03.02.2014 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 6
03.02.2014 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
03.02.2014 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
03.02.2014 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
03.02.2014 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
20.12.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.12.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
20.12.2013 Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
12.11.2013 Written opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
12.11.2013 Written opinion - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 7
12.11.2013 Written opinion - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
26.06.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 18
06.06.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
06.06.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 16
25.03.2013 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
25.03.2013 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
13.03.2013 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 4
13.03.2013 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
13.03.2013 Payment of fees and costs PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
08.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
08.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
08.02.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
02.11.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
02.11.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 2
02.11.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 11
02.11.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1
02.11.2012 Payment of fees and costs PCT receiving Office 1