blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2786235


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
07.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.11.2016  [2016/45]
22.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
01.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.08.2016  [2016/31]
10.06.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.07.2016  [2016/28]
13.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
11.03.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  13.04.2016  [2016/15]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
13.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.12.2015  [2015/51]
06.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.12.2015  [2015/50]
04.11.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.12.2015  [2015/49]
11.04.2015 (Expected) grant published on  06.05.2015  [2015/19]
31.03.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
31.03.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
28.03.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.02.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.02.2015 Change - extension states published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
04.12.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
05.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  08.10.2014  [2014/41]
04.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
17.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
28.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication