Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786235

EP2786235 - ACTUATING DEVICE HAVING A TOUCH-SENSITIVE SURFACE WHICH CAN BE MANUALLY OPERATED [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.03.2016
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Audi AG
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHNEIDER, Johann
Schillerstrasse 18
85139 Wettstetten / DE
02 / MÜLLER, Ulrich
Unterer Taubentalweg 9
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Brandt, Kai
Audi AG
Patentabteilung I/EZ-1
85045 Ingolstadt / DE
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12788122.502.11.2012
WO2012EP04584
Priority number, dateDE20111011974630.11.2011         Original published format: DE102011119746
[2014/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079145
Date:06.06.2013
Language:DE
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786235
Date:08.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786235
Date:06.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/044, G06F3/01, G06F3/045
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:BETÄTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER MANUELL ZU BEDIENENDEN BERÜHRUNGSSENSITIVEN OBERFLÄCHE[2014/41]
English:ACTUATING DEVICE HAVING A TOUCH-SENSITIVE SURFACE WHICH CAN BE MANUALLY OPERATED[2014/41]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE COMPORTANT UNE SURFACE TACTILE DESTINÉE À ÊTRE ACTIVÉE MANUELLEMENT[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
17.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2015Fee for grant paid
26.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2015
Opposition(s)09.02.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.11.2012
AL06.05.2015
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE02.11.2015
LU02.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU02.11.2012
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
TR06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE02.11.2015
LU02.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2018/31]HU02.11.2012
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MK06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE02.11.2015
LU02.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2017/39]HU02.11.2012
CY06.05.2015
CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
MT06.05.2015
NL06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SE06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
SM06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE02.11.2015
LU02.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/45]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
IE02.11.2015
LU02.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/34]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU02.11.2015
CH30.11.2015
LI30.11.2015
Former [2016/31]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
LU02.11.2015
Former [2016/28]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
MC06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/24]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SI06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/21]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
IT06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ06.05.2015
DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
PL06.05.2015
RO06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
SK06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/09]DK06.05.2015
EE06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2016/07]DK06.05.2015
ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
BG06.08.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
IS06.09.2015
PT07.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES06.05.2015
FI06.05.2015
HR06.05.2015
LT06.05.2015
LV06.05.2015
RS06.05.2015
NO06.08.2015
GR07.08.2015
PT07.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2011141047  (IWAIZUMI TOMOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0042] - [0044] - [0051] , [0056] , [0057] , [0066] , [0072] - [0075] - [0094] - [0098] * [I] 3;
 [A]US2010057235  (WANG QIHONG [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 17] , [0 70] - [0076] - [0082] , [0087] , [0157] *;
 [A]EP2290510  (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0045] *;
 [A]EP2261781  (TYCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0016] *