Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782931

EP2782931 - CD40L EXPRESSING MAMMALIAN CELLS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / ENDL, Josef
Ulmenstrasse 12
82362 Weilheim / DE
02 / FISCHER, Jens
Andreas-Schmidtner-Strasse 42
82362 Weilheim / DE
03 / KERN, Peter
Sperberweg 11
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / OFFNER, Sonja
Waxensteinstrasse 27
82377 Penzberg / DE
05 / PLATZER, Josef
Schlierseeweg 9
82538 Geretsried / DE
06 / SEEBER, Stefan
Mitterweg 2
82404 Sindelsdorf / DE
 [2016/47]
Former [2014/40]01 / ENDL, Josef
Ulmenstrasse 12
82362 Weilheim / DE
02 / FISCHER, Jens
Baerenmuehlweg 15
82362 Weilheim / DE
03 / KERN, Peter
Sperberweg 11
82377 Penzberg / DE
04 / OFFNER, Sonja
Waxensteinstrasse 27
82377 Penzberg / DE
05 / PLATZER, Josef
Schlierseeweg 9
82538 Geretsried / DE
06 / SEEBER, Stefan
Mitterweg 2
82404 Sindelsdorf / DE
Representative(s)Burger, Alexander , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Patentabteilung
Nonnenwald 2
82377 Penzberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Burger, Alexander , et al
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52
82372 Penzberg / DE
Application number, filing date12788221.521.11.2012
[2016/50]
WO2012EP73232
Priority number, dateEP2011019034123.11.2011         Original published format: EP 11190341
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076139
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782931
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782931
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/00, C07K16/28, C12N5/0781
[2016/22]
Former International [2014/40]C07K16/00, C12N5/16, C12N5/0781
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SÄUGERZELLEN ZUR CD40L-EXPRESSION UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[2014/40]
English:CD40L EXPRESSING MAMMALIAN CELLS AND THEIR USE[2014/40]
French:EXPRESSION AU CD40L DES CELLULES DE MAMMIFÈRES ET UTILISATION[2016/22]
Former [2014/40]CELLULES DE MAMMIFÈRE EXPRIMANT CD40L ET APPLICATIONS ASSOCIÉES
Entry into regional phase23.06.2014National basic fee paid 
23.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
09.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2016Fee for grant paid
13.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16203631.3  / EP3176178
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2015
Opposition(s)15.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.11.2012
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CY14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU21.11.2012
AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/33]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
MC14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SI14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
DK14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT14.12.2016
BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
SM14.12.2016
BG14.03.2017
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
PT14.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE14.12.2016
CZ14.12.2016
EE14.12.2016
FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
PL14.12.2016
RO14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
SK14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
IS14.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
NL14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI14.12.2016
HR14.12.2016
LT14.12.2016
LV14.12.2016
RS14.12.2016
SE14.12.2016
NO14.03.2017
GR15.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV14.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2011052545  (UNIV TOKYO SCI EDUC FOUND [JP], et al) [I] 1-29 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2009105150  (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * examples 1,3,4 * * figure 1 * * claims 1-30 *;
 [Y]WO2008085878  (MORPHOTEK INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * paragraph [0160] *;
 [Y]  - AMANNA I J ET AL, "Quantitation of rare memory B cell populations by two independent and complementary approaches", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 317, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.JIM.2006.09.005, ISSN 0022-1759, (20061220), pages 175 - 185, (20061220), XP025158255 [Y] 1-29 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2006.09.005
by applicantUS2006051348
 WO2008144763
 WO2008045140
 US2007269868
 WO2007031550
 WO2009010515
 WO2008085878
 WO2011052545
 US5010182
 EP0362179
    - SPIEKER-POLET, H., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 9348 - 9352
    - ZUBLER, R. ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 14, pages 357 - 363
    - J. EXP. MED., (1984), vol. 160, pages 1170 - 1183
    - NERON, S. ET AL., ARCH. IMMUNOL. THER. EXP., (2011), vol. 59, pages 25 - 40
    - WEITKAMP, J-H. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (2003), vol. 275, pages 223 - 237
    - MASRI ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 44, pages 2101 - 2106
    - J. IMMUNOL. METH, (2006), vol. 317, pages 175 - 185
    - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, WILEY AND SONS, (1997), vol. I-II
    - KABAT, E.A. ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NIH PUBLICATION 91-3242, (1991), pages 1 - 3
    - MORGAN, D. ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1987), vol. 26, pages 2959 - 2963
    - PAK, S.C.O. ET AL., CYTOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 22, pages 139 - 146
    - KABAT, E.A. ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NIH PUBLICATION 91-3242, (1991), vol. 1-3
    - CHOTHIA, C.; LESK, A.M., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - KABAT, E.A. ET AL., Sequences of Proteins of Immunological Interest, NIH PUBLICATION 91-3242, (1991), vol. 1-3.
    - ALMAGRO, J.C.; FRANSSON, J., FRONT. BIOSCI., (2008), vol. 13, pages 1619 - 1633
    - KINDT, T.J. ET AL., Kuby Immunology, W.H. FREEMAN AND CO., (2007), page 91
    - PORTOLANO, S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1993), vol. 150, pages 880 - 887
    - CLACKSON, T. ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - PAUS, D. ET AL., JEM, (2006), vol. 203, pages 1081 - 1091
    - SMITH, K.G.S. ET AL., THE EMBO J., (1997), vol. 16, pages 2996 - 3006
    - WRAMMERT, J. ET AL., NATURE, (2008), vol. 453, pages 667 - 672
    - EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1984), vol. 14, pages 357 - 363