Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782922

EP2782922 - ANTIBACTERIAL TYLOSIN DERIVATIVES AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.10.2018
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.06.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
For all designated states
The Kitasato Institute
9-1, Shirokane 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8641 / JP
[2017/51]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
For all designated states
The Kitasato Institute
9-1, Shirokane 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8641 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SATOSHI, Omura
3-12 Okamoto 3-Chome
Setagaya-ku Tokyo 157-0076 / JP
02 / TOSHIAKI, Sunazuka
353-6-405 Gyoda-cho
Funabashi-shi Chiba 273-0043 / JP
03 / TOMOYASU, Hirose
44-12-2 Takaishi 2-Chome
Asao-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 215-0003 / JP
04 / AKIHIRO, Sugawara
4-20-303 Kamishakujii 2-Chome
Nerima-ku Tokyo 177-0044 / JP
05 / KAZURO, Shiomi
23-7-202 Ebisu 1-Chome
Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0013 / JP
06 / KLEEFELD, Gerd
Franziskusstr. 27
41468 Neuss / DE
07 / FROYMAN, Robrecht
Heerweg 112
40789 Monheim / DE
08 / DÖRNER, Julia, Charlotte
Fischelner Str. 67
40668 Meerbusch / DE
09 / LUDWIG, Carolin
Parkstr. 23
40789 Monheim / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Postfach 18 04 09
40571 Düsseldorf / DE
[2017/51]
Former [2014/40]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date12788225.621.11.2012
[2017/51]
WO2012EP73277
Priority number, dateEP2011019074825.11.2011         Original published format: EP 11190748
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076169
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782922
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782922
Date:20.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07H17/08, A61K31/7048, A61P31/04
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANTIBAKTERIELLE TYLOSINDERIVATE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2014/40]
English:ANTIBACTERIAL TYLOSIN DERIVATIVES AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION[2014/40]
French:DÉRIVÉS ANTIBACTÉRIENS DE TYLOSINE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
16.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
06.02.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2017Fee for grant paid
10.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.08.2015
Opposition(s)21.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
MC20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
IS20.04.2018
[2019/33]
Former [2018/40]CY20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
IS20.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY20.12.2017
EE20.12.2017
LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
SM20.12.2017
Former [2018/25]LT20.12.2017
LV20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
Former [2018/23]LT20.12.2017
RS20.12.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2007025089  (RIB X PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; BHATTACHARJEE ASHOKE [US]; KANYO ZOLTA) [Y] 1-14 * page 113; claim -; compounds 222, 223 *;
 [Y]WO2005085266  (RIB X PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; FARMER JAY J [US]; BHATTACHARJEE ASHOK) [Y] 1-14 * page 177; claim 21; compounds 623-626 *;
 [YD]WO2005118610  (RIB X PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]; CHEN YI [US]; FARMER JAY J [US]; SUTCL) [YD] 1-14 * paragraph 2 of page 4; pages 37, 56; compounds 47, 150 *;
 [Y]EP0201166  (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [Y] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 1; examples 14, 22, 23 *
by applicant   - WOODWARD, R. B., ANGEW. CHEM., (1957), vol. 69, pages 50 - 58
    - BROCKMANN, H.; HENKEL, W., NATURWISSENSHAFTEN, (1950), vol. 37, page 138
    - PINNERT-SINDICO, S.; NINET, L.; PREUD'HOMME, J.; COSAR, C., ANTIBIOTICS ANN., (1955), vol. 2, pages 1954 - 1955
    - HANSEN, J. L.; IPPOLITO, J.A.; BAN, N.; NISSEN, P.; MOORE, P. B.; STEITZ, T. A., MOLECULAR CELL, (2002), vol. 10, page 117
    - DUCRUIX, A.; PASCARD, C.; NAKAGAWA, A.; OMURA, S., J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMMUN., (1976), page 947
    - MORIN, R. B.; GORMAN, M.; HAMILL, R. L., TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1970), vol. 11, pages 4737 - 4740
    - OMURA, S.; NAKAGAWA, A.; NESZMELYI, A.; GERO, S. D; SEPULCRE, A. M.; PIRIOU, F.; LUKACS, G., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1975), vol. 97, pages 4001 - 4009
    - MCGUIRE, J. M., ANTIBIOT. CHEMOTHER., (1961), vol. 11, pages 320 - 327
    - DEBONO, M.; KIRST, H. A.; OMURA, S., J. ANTIBIOT., (1989), vol. 42, pages 1253 - 1267
    - ROGERT A. SMITH, "Impact of disease on feedlot performance: A review", J. ANIM. SCI., (1998), vol. 76, pages 276 - 274
    - MAINA, H.; JOHN, D. B.; BEN A., FEMS MICROBIOL. LETT., (2006), vol. 256, pages 1 - 10
    - KOLB, H. C.; FINN, M. G.; SHARPLESS, K. B., ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2001), vol. 40, pages 2004 - 2021
    - ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2002), vol. 41, pages 2596 - 2599
    - HUISGEN, R., PURE APPLE CHEM., (1989), vol. 61, pages 613 - 628
    - HIROSE, T.; SUNAZUKA, T.; NOGUCHI, Y.; YAMAGUCHI, Y.; HANAKI, H.; SHARPLESS, K. B.; OMURA, S., HETEROCYCLES, (2006), vol. 69, pages 55 - 61
    - KIRST, H. A.; TOTH, J. E.; DEBONO, M.; WILLARD, K. E.; TRUEDELL, B. A.; OTT, J. L.; COUNTER, F. T.; FELTY-DUCKWORTH, A. M.; PEKARE, J. MED. CHEM., (1988), vol. 31, pages 1631 - 1641
    - MEREU, A.; MORIGGI, E.; NAPOLETANO, M.; REGAZZONI, C.; MANFREDINI, S.; MERCURIO, T. P.; PELLACINI, F., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2006), vol. 16, pages 5801 - 5804
    - ROSTOVTSEV, V. V.; GREEN, L. G.; FORKIN, V. V.; SHARPLESS, K. B., ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2002), vol. 41, page 2597
    - CHAN, T. R.; HILGRAF, R.; SHARPLESS, K. B.; FOKIN, V. V., ORG. LETT., (2004), vol. 6, pages 2853 - 2855
    - NOBORU KAGEI, JOURNAL OF PREVENTIVE MEDICINE, (1985), vol. 199, pages 32 - 33
    - TSUYOSHI YAMADA, Fight between bacterium and human, ISHIYAKU PUBLISHERS, INC.
    - SATOSHI OMURA; RUIKO OIWA, CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, (1982), vol. 20, pages 10 - 12
    - CASSINELLI, G.; COTTA, G.; D'AMICO, G.; DELLA, B. C.; GREIN, A.; MAZZOLENI, R.; RICCIARDI, M. L.; TINTINELLI, R., ARCH. MIKROBIOL., (1970), vol. 70, pages 197 - 210
    - BRUNA, D. C.; RICCIARDI, M. L.; SANFILIPPO, A., ANTIMICROB. AGENTS. CHEMOTHER., (1973), vol. 3, pages 708 - 710
    - HAMILL, R. L.; HOEHN, M. M., J. ANTIBIOT., (1964), vol. 17, pages 100 - 103
    - PROBST, G. W.; HOEHN, M. M.; WOODS, B. L., ANTIMICROB. AGENTS. CHEMOTHER, (1966), pages 789 - 795
    - HANEISI, T.; ARAI, M.; KITANO, N.; YAMAMOTO, S., J. ANTIBIOT., (1974), vol. 27, pages 339 - 342
    - MASATOSHI INUKAI; HIROSHI MISHIMA, Current Chemistry special 9 ''Advanced antibiotics, TOKYO KAGAKUDOJIN, (1987), pages 37 - 43
    - OMURA, S.; OTOGURO, K.; IMAMURA, N.; HUGA, H.; TAKAHASHI, Y.; MASUMA, R.; TANAKA, Y.; TANAKA, H.; XUE-HUI, S.; EN-TAI, Y., J. ANTIBIO, (1987), vol. 40, pages 623 - 629
    - IMAMURA, N.; KUGA, H.; OTOGURO, K.; TANAKA, H.; OMURA, S., J. ANTIBIO., (1989), vol. 42, pages 156 - 158
    - GIENCKE, W.; ORT, 0.; STARK, H., LIEBIGS. ANN. CHEM., (1989), pages 671 - 676
    - MOSS, R. A.; LANDON, M. J.; LUCHTER, K. M.; MAMANTOV, A., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1972), vol. 94, pages 4392 - 4394
    - TSUZUKI, K.; YAN, F.; OTOGURO, K.; OMURA, S., J. ANTIBIOT., (1991), vol. 44, pages 774 - 784
    - KAR, A.; ARGADE, N. P., TETRAHEDRON, (2003), vol. 59, page 2991
    - NAM, N. H.; KIM, Y.; YOU, Y. J.; HONG, D. H.; KIM, H. M.; AHN, B. Z., BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2002), vol. 12, pages 1955 - 1958
    - NAORA, H.; OHNUKI, T.; NAKAMURA, A., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1988), vol. 61, pages 993 - 994
    - THAKKALAPALLY, A.; BENIN, V., TETRAHEDRON, (2005), vol. 61, pages 4939 - 4948
    - ROSTOVTSEV, V. V.; GREEN, L. G.; FOKIN, V. V.; SHARPLESS, K. B., ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2002), vol. 41, pages 2596 - 2599
    - Science of Synthesis: Houben-Weyl Methods of Molecular Transformation, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (2005), vol. 48, page 41627
    - The Peptides, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1981), vol. 3
    - HOUBEN WEYL, Methoden der organischen Chemie, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, (1974), vol. 15/I
    - ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1996), vol. 19, page 115
    - J. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 39, page 10
    - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methods of Organic Synthesis, THIEME, (1952), vol. 21