Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2782922 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2782922



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1088
24.10.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.01.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.12.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.11.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
10.10.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2017 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.10.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 6
10.10.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
10.10.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.06.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.06.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 138
19.06.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 138
06.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.02.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 19
06.02.2017 Claims Search / examination 8
06.02.2017 Description Search / examination 10
06.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.01.2017 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
22.12.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.12.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
06.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.12.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
05.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.10.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.05.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
27.05.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 9
16.02.2016 Claims Search / examination 8
16.02.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.02.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.12.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
09.12.2015 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.08.2015 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.08.2015 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 9
16.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 15
16.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
16.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
13.08.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.07.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.07.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
13.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.05.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
13.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
04.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 156
30.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.05.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 153
04.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
04.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
04.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
21.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
21.11.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
21.11.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 13
21.11.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 139
21.11.2012 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 155