Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2782922


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
26.10.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.11.2018  [2018/48]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
01.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
04.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.06.2018  [2018/23]
17.11.2017 (Expected) grant published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
15.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
13.10.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.10.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.06.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.02.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
10.01.2017 Change - representative
07.12.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
14.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.10.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.06.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
19.02.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
12.12.2015 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
13.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.08.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
07.08.2015 First examination report
30.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
20.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
14.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
12.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.12.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
28.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication