Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2782922 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280068037 EP12788225



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9593140Global Dossier 14.03.2017B2
US2014349954 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6170064BGlobal Dossier 26.07.2017B2
JP2014533710 15.12.2014A
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104302653BGlobal Dossier 22.02.2017B
CN104302653 21.01.2015A
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2782922Global Dossier 20.12.2017B1
EP2782922 01.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
EP12788225 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2012342548B 24.08.2017B2
AU2012342548 29.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014012585 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2856708 30.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2782922T 22.01.2018T3
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2661456T 02.04.2018T3
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1202121 18.09.2015A1
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20180428T 04.05.2018T1
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
EP12788225 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO2782922T 19.05.2018T3
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
EP12788225 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ625402 24.06.2016A
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2782922T 31.07.2018T3
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
EP12788225 21.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2782922T 31.05.2018T1
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73277 21.11.2012
EP12788225 21.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013076169Global Dossier 30.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE036856T 28.08.2018T2
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT2782922T 05.02.2018T
Priority number Date
EP11190748 25.11.2011