Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2773273

EP2773273 - ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Söring GmbH
Justus-von-Liebig-Ring 2
25451 Quickborn / DE
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / NEUMANN, Florian
Justus-von-Liebig-Ring 2
25451 Quickborn / DE
02 / ZOBAWA, Klaus
Justus-von-Liebig-Ring 2
25451 Quickborn / DE
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/37]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date12788477.331.10.2012
[2015/43]
WO2012EP71592
Priority number, dateDE2011108550131.10.2011         Original published format: DE102011085501
[2014/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013064551
Date:10.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2773273
Date:10.09.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013
[2014/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2773273
Date:21.10.2015
Language:DE
[2015/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/12, A61B18/14, A61B18/00
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHIRURGIEVORRICHTUNG[2014/37]
English:ELECTROSURGICAL DEVICE[2014/37]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIRURGICAL[2014/37]
Entry into regional phase27.03.2014National basic fee paid 
27.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/37]
16.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.05.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2015Fee for grant paid
10.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.05.2015
Opposition(s)22.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.10.2012
AL21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
IE31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
LU31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU31.10.2012
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
IE31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
LU31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2018/02]HU31.10.2012
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
IE31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
LU31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2017/39]HU31.10.2012
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
BE31.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
IE31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
IE31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/45]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
IE31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/33]FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/25]FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/24]FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
GR22.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/23]HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/22]LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/21]LT21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
Former [2016/20]LT21.10.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO9920213  (ARTHROCARE CORP [US]) [X] 1-8,10,12 * pages 5-8,20, * * pages 27,28; figures 2-6,9-11 * [I] 9,11;
 [A]US2010130976  (BYSTRYAK ILYA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2008112931  (HALT MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *