Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782904

EP2782904 - NOVEL HETEROCYCLIC ALKANOL-DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.10.2016
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.11.2016  [2016/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / HOFFMANN, Sebastian
Zypressenweg 12
41470 Neuss / DE
02 / HELMKE, Hendrik
Zum Morgengraben 22
65835 Liederbach / DE
03 / PERIS, Gorka
Meerfeldstr.11
50737 Köln / DE
04 / NISING, Carl, Friedrich
Hüscheider Str. 38c
51381 Leverkusen / DE
05 / TSUCHIYA, Tomoki
16 rue Jean Marie Leclair
F-69009 Lyon / FR
06 / SUDAU, Alexander
Locher Weg 17F
40764 Langenfeld / DE
07 / BENTING, Jürgen
Amselstr. 7
42799 Leichlingen / DE
08 / BERNIER, David
38 quai Joseph Gillet
F-69004 Lyon / FR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]BIP Patents
c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH
Creative Campus Monheim
Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10
40789 Monheim / DE
Application number, filing date12788571.323.11.2012
WO2012EP73426
Priority number, dateEP2011019068425.11.2011         Original published format: EP 11190684
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076227
Date:30.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782904
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:C07D263/32, C07D277/24, A01N43/76, A01N43/78
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
TitleGerman:NEUE HETEROCYCLISCHE ALKANOL-DERIVATE[2014/40]
English:NOVEL HETEROCYCLIC ALKANOL-DERIVATIVES[2014/40]
French:NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS D'ALCANOL HÉTÉROCYCLIQUES[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase25.06.2014National basic fee paid 
25.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
13.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/48]
26.07.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/48]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[YD]EP0395175  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [YD] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [YD]EP0409418  (ICI PLC [GB]) [YD] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP2177496  (ASSIST PUBL HOPITAUX DE PARIS [FR], et al) [X] 10 * compounds III, IX *;
 [X]EP0112292  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 11 * example H1; claim 6 *;
 [XY]WO2004108684  (SSP CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 11 * compound 3 * * abstract * [Y] 1-11
 [X]  - JOHN A. MURPHY ET AL, "Direct Conversion of N -Methoxy- N -methylamides (Weinreb Amides) to Ketones via a Nonclassical Wittig Reaction", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20050301), vol. 7, no. 7, doi:10.1021/ol050337b, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 1427 - 1429, XP055019373 [X] 10 * compound 20 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol050337b
 [X]  - JOHN M. HATCHER ET AL, "Catalytic Asymmetric Addition of Thiols to Nitrosoalkenes Leading to Chiral Non-Racemic [alpha]-Sulfenyl Ketones", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20110805), vol. 13, no. 15, doi:10.1021/ol2012633, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 3810 - 3813, XP055019370 [X] 10 * compound 38 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol2012633
 [X]  - MIEKO ARISAWA ET AL, "Rhodium-Catalyzed Organothio Exchange Reaction of [alpha]-Organothioketones with Disulfides", CHEMICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, (20100101), vol. 58, no. 10, doi:10.1248/cpb.58.1349, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1349 - 1352, XP055019376 [X] 10 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1248/cpb.58.1349
by applicantEP0395175
 EP0409418
 DE3440116
 EP0180136
 JPH06279419
 DE3220730
 JPH04112874
 DE3608792
 DE3535456
 EP0121171
 DE3627071
 EP0906292
 US2009318436
 US2008267942
 US4272417
 US4245432
 US4808430
 US5876739
 US2003176428
 WO02080675
 WO0228186
 WO8910396
 WO0166704
 WO9638567
 WO9924585
 WO9924586
 WO2009144079
 WO0246387
 US6768044
 WO9934008
 WO0236787
 WO2004024928
 WO2007103567
 WO2008150473
 US5084082
 WO9741218
 US5773702
 WO9957965
 US5198599
 WO0165922
 EP1999141
 WO2007107302
 WO2007027777
 WO9421795
    - Z. ANORG. ALLG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 627, pages 2408 - 2412
    - SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1995), pages 4081 - 4086
    - ORGANIC LETTERS, (2010), pages 236 - 238
    - ORGANIC LETTERS, (2010), pages 5470 - 5473
    - R. WEGLER, Chemie der Pflanzenschutz-und Schädlingsbekämpfungsmittel, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1970), vol. 2, pages 401 - 412
    - COMAI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1983), vol. 221, pages 370 - 371
    - BARRY ET AL., CURR. TOPICS PLANT PHYSIOL., (1992), vol. 7, pages 139 - 145
    - SHAH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 478 - 481
    - GASSER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 4280 - 4289
    - TRANEL; WRIGHT, WEED SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 50, pages 700 - 712
    - CRICKMORE ET AL., MICROBIOLOGY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY REVIEWS, (1998), vol. 62, pages 807 - 813
    - NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 19, pages 668 - 72
    - APPLIED ENVIRONM. MICROBIOL., (2006), vol. 71, pages 1765 - 1774
    - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE DATABASE NUMBER 564025, 2011, (20110316), URL: http://www.rdelectronic.co.uk/rd/free/RD564025.pdf
 US20040926819
 US20040782020
 US20040783417
 US20040782096
 US20070657964
 US20080192904
 US20060396808
 US20080166253
 US20080166239
 US20080166124
 US20080166209
 US20070762886
 US20090364335
 US20070763947
 US20080252453
 US20080209354
 US20090491396
 US20090497221
 US20080249016
 US20080214022
 EP20080010791
 US20080126083
 US20080195019