Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2782904 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2782904



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 322
25.10.2016 Closing of application Search / examination 1
26.07.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.06.2016 Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.06.2016 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Search / examination 1
08.02.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
08.02.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.02.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.06.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
13.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
13.01.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
13.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.09.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.07.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
09.07.2014 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
12.06.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
16.05.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.05.2014 General authorisation Search / examination 1
16.05.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
04.04.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
23.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 61
30.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.05.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
30.05.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 63
23.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
23.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
23.01.2013 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
23.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
23.11.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
23.11.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 4
23.11.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 58
23.11.2012 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 60