Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2782904


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.10.2016 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  30.11.2016  [2016/48]
25.07.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.02.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
05.02.2016 First examination report
13.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
30.01.2015 Change - extension states published on  04.03.2015  [2015/10]
15.01.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
09.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
16.05.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
10.06.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
31.05.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
30.11.2012 PCT data prior to European publication