Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2782904 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280068130 EP12788571



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9198429Global Dossier 01.12.2015B2
US2014274952 18.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140098164Global Dossier 07.08.2014A
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2015502933Global Dossier 29.01.2015A
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104066725Global Dossier 24.09.2014A
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2782904Global Dossier 01.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
EP12788571 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014012588 13.06.2017A2
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2856711 30.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA201491031 28.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN3823CHENP2014 16.10.2015A
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2014006073 08.08.2014A
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
WO2012EP73426 23.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013076227Global Dossier 30.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR088981 23.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CO6970612 13.06.2014A2
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201328599 16.07.2013A
Priority number Date
EP11190684 25.11.2011