Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2782441

EP2782441 - SINGLE-SCREW EXTRUDER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTICIZED FOOD PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Helix GmbH
Johannes-Giesser-Strasse 8
71364 Winnenden / DE
For all designated states
Universität Hohenheim
Schloss 1
70599 Stuttgart / DE
[2016/51]
Former [2015/50]For all designated states
Helix GmbH
Johannes-Giesser-Strasse 8
71364 Winnenden / DE
For all designated states
Universität Hohenheim
Schloss 1
70599 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Hinrichs, Jörg
Spitzkrautweg 19
70599 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Migliore, Giovanni
Brühlstrasse 28
72141 Walddorfhäslach / DE
For all designated states
Bähler, Balz
Adornostrasse 33
70599 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Weinbrenner, Armin
Im Weiler 20
71566 Althütte / DE
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Helix GmbH
Gottlieb-Daimler-Strasse 1
71334 Waiblingen / DE
For all designated states
Universität Hohenheim
Schloss 1
70599 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Hinrichs, Jörg
Spitzkrautweg 19
70599 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Migliore, Giovanni
Brühlstrasse 28
72141 Walddorfhäslach / DE
For all designated states
Bähler, Balz
Adornostrasse 33
70599 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Weinbrenner, Armin
Im Weiler 20
71566 Althütte / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HINRICHS, Jörg
Spitzkrautweg 19
70599 Stuttgart / DE
02 / MIGLIORE, Giovanni
Brühlstrasse 28
72141 Walddorfhäslach / DE
03 / BÄHLER, Balz
Adornostrasse 33
70599 Stuttgart / DE
04 / WEINBRENNER, Armin
Im Weiler 20
71566 Althütte / DE
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB
Kronenstraße 30
70174 Stuttgart / DE
[2017/12]
Former [2014/40]Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner
Postfach 10 40 36
70035 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12788579.623.11.2012
[2017/12]
WO2012EP73446
Priority number, dateDE2011108698123.11.2011         Original published format: DE102011086981
[2014/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076237
Date:30.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2782441
Date:01.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2782441
Date:22.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:A23C19/068, B29C47/66, B29C47/38, B30B11/24, A01J25/00
[2016/35]
Former International [2014/40]A01J25/00, A23C19/068, B30B11/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINSCHNECKENEXTRUDER UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES PLASTIFIZIERTEN LEBENSMITTELPRODUKTES[2014/40]
English:SINGLE-SCREW EXTRUDER AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTICIZED FOOD PRODUCT[2014/40]
French:EXTRUDEUSE MONOVIS ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FABRIQUER UN PRODUIT ALIMENTAIRE PLASTIFIÉ[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2014National basic fee paid 
31.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
02.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2017Fee for grant paid
09.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2016
Opposition(s)02.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.11.2012
CY22.03.2017
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
GB23.11.2017
IE23.11.2017
LU23.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU23.11.2012
CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
GB23.11.2017
IE23.11.2017
LU23.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
Former [2018/50]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
GB23.11.2017
IE23.11.2017
LU23.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
Former [2018/45]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
IE23.11.2017
LU23.11.2017
Former [2018/43]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
MT22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
LU23.11.2017
Former [2018/41]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
LU23.11.2017
Former [2018/33]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
MC22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SI22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ22.03.2017
DK22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
SM22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
PT24.07.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
PL22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ22.03.2017
EE22.03.2017
ES22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RO22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
SK22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
IS22.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ22.03.2017
FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI22.03.2017
HR22.03.2017
LT22.03.2017
LV22.03.2017
RS22.03.2017
SE22.03.2017
BG22.06.2017
NO22.06.2017
GR23.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5939124  (WENGER LAVON G [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 4-9,11,12,14-19,23-26;
 [YD]DE102008026969  (MUELLER ALOIS MOLKEREI [DE]) [YD] 1,4-9,11,12,14-20,23-26 * the whole document *;
 [Y]DE10206484  (REHART GMBH [DE]; INOFEX FLEISCH LEBENSMITTELTEC [DE]) [Y] 1,4-9,11,12,14-20,23-26 * the whole document *;
 [YD]EP2168429  (BUEHLER AG [CH]) [YD] 4-9,11,12,14-20,23-26 * the whole document *;
 [YA]WO2011026542  (CMT COSTR MECC & TEC [IT]; TOMATIS STEFANO [IT]) [Y] 15,16 * the whole document * [A] 1-14,17-26;
 [A]GB742662  (NAT RUBBER MACHINERY CO) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *
ExaminationDE10130759
by applicantDE102008026969
 EP2168429