Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2786586

EP2786586 - PROCESSING DEVICE FOR THE GENERATION OF 3D CONTENT VERSIONS AND ASSOCIATED DEVICE FOR OBTAINING CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
3 rue du Colonel Moll
75017 Paris / FR
[2019/19]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Inventor(s)01 / GOUACHE, Stephane
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D France
975 avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17676
35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
02 / DOYEN, Didier
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D France
975 avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17676
35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
03 / BICHOT, Guillaume
c/o TECHNICOLOR R&D France
975 avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17676
35576 Cesson-Sévigné / FR
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Amor, Rim , et al
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2019/27]
Former [2014/41]Rolland, Sophie
Technicolor
1, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date12788595.223.11.2012
[2019/27]
WO2012EP73530
Priority number, dateFR2011006086828.11.2011         Original published format: FR 1160868
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079420
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2786586
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2786586
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/2343, H04N21/845, H04N13/00
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON 3D-INHALTSVERSIONEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN ERHALT VON INHALTEN[2014/41]
English:PROCESSING DEVICE FOR THE GENERATION OF 3D CONTENT VERSIONS AND ASSOCIATED DEVICE FOR OBTAINING CONTENT[2014/41]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT POUR LA GÉNÉRATION DE VERSIONS DE CONTENU TRIDIMENSIONNEL (3D) ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ POUR OBTENIR UN CONTENU[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2014National basic fee paid 
24.04.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
22.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.05.2019Fee for grant paid
24.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2011208829  (KWON O-HOON [KR] ET AL) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0243] - paragraph [0246] * * paragraph [0258] - paragraph [0259] *
 [X]  - TEKALP A M ET AL, "3DTV over IP", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING MAGAZINE, IEEE, US, (200711), vol. 24, no. 6, doi:10.1109/MSP.2007.905878, pages 77 - 87, XP002681036 [X] 1-12 * page 82; figure 5 * * page 83; figure 7 * * page 84, column 2, lines 1-10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MSP.2007.905878
 [Y]  - GURLER C G ET AL, "Adaptive stereoscopic 3D video streaming", 2010 PROCEEDINGS OF 17TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP 2010), IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100926), ISBN 978-1-4244-7992-4, pages 2409 - 2412, XP002681066 [Y] 1-12 * page 2409, column 2 - lines 1-25 * * page 2410, paragraph 2.1 - page 2411, paragraph 3.2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2010.5651035
 [Y]  - SAYGILI G ET AL, "Quality assessment of asymmetric stereo video coding", 2010 PROCEEDINGS OF 17TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP 2010), IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2010), ISBN 978-1-4244-7992-4, pages 4009 - 4012, XP002681067 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 4010, paragraph 2 - page 4011; figure 1; tables 3-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2010.5653339
 [Y]  - VAN LANCKER W ET AL, "HTTP adaptive streaming with media fragment URIS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO (ICME 2011), IEEE PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20110711), ISBN 978-1-61284-349-0, page 6 pp., XP002681037 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2.2 * * page 3, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2011.6012149
 [Y]  - GORAN PETROVIC ET AL, "Toward 3D-IPTV: design and implementation of a stereoscopic and multiple-perspective video streaming system", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, US, vol. 6803, doi:10.1117/12.766327, ISSN 0277-786X, (20080128), pages 505 - 512, (20080229), XP008148964 [Y] 1-12 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2.3 * * page 4, paragraph 3.3 * * page 5, paragraph 4.1 - page 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.766327