Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783212

EP2783212 - NOVEL MARKERS OF PAPILLARY AND RETICULAR FIBROBLASTS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chanel Parfums Beauté
135 avenue Charles de Gaulle
92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR
For all designated states
Leiden University Medical Center
Albinusdreef 2
2333 ZA Leiden / NL
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / SAINTIGNY, Gaelle
40 rue Delisy
F-93694 Pantin / FR
02 / ELGHALBZOURI, Abdelouahab
Postzone S2-P
P.O. Box 9600
2300 RC Leiden / NL
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/40]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2014/40]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date12790557.823.11.2012
[2016/40]
WO2012EP73458
Priority number, dateEP2011030656625.11.2011         Original published format: EP 11306566
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013076240
Date:30.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783212
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2783212
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/50
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NEUARTIGE MARKER FÜR PAPILLÄRE UND RETIKULÄRE FIBROBLASTEN SOWIE VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR[2014/40]
English:NOVEL MARKERS OF PAPILLARY AND RETICULAR FIBROBLASTS AND USES THEREOF[2014/40]
French:NOUVEAUX MARQUEURS DE FIBROBLASTES RÉTICULAIRES ET PAPILLAIRES ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI[2014/40]
Entry into regional phase16.05.2014National basic fee paid 
16.05.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
16.05.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
12.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2016Fee for grant paid
29.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.04.2015
Opposition(s)06.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
16.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.11.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
TR05.10.2016
IE23.11.2016
MT23.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
[2018/45]
Former [2018/43]HU23.11.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE23.11.2016
MT23.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2018/30]HU23.11.2012
AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CY05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
MK05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE23.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SI05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
IE23.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/43]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
BG05.01.2017
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
IT05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
SM05.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
EE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RO05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
SK05.10.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
CZ05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
DK05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
MC05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
ES05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
PT06.02.2017
Former [2017/23]AT05.10.2016
BE05.10.2016
FI05.10.2016
HR05.10.2016
LT05.10.2016
LV05.10.2016
NL05.10.2016
PL05.10.2016
RS05.10.2016
SE05.10.2016
NO05.01.2017
GR06.01.2017
IS05.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV05.10.2016
BE30.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE10050274  (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 14] , [0 39] , [0 40] , [0 48] *;
 [A]WO02053773  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7192719  (ASSELINEAU DANIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]  - QUATRESOOZ PASCALE ET AL, "Immunohistochemical clues at aging of the skin microvascular unit.", JOURNAL OF CUTANEOUS PATHOLOGY, (200901), vol. 36, no. 1, ISSN 1600-0560, pages 39 - 43, XP002675625 [Y] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/J.1600-0560.2008.00994.X
 [Y]  - MINE SOLÈNE ET AL, "Aging alters functionally human dermal papillary fibroblasts but not reticular fibroblasts: a new view of skin morphogenesis and aging.", PLOS ONE, (200812), vol. 3, no. 12, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 13, XP002675626 [Y] 1,5-7 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0004066
by applicant   - International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook, THE COSMETIC, TOILETRY AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION,
    - MINE S; FORTUNEL NO; PAGEON H; ASSELINEAU D, "Aging alters functionally human dermal papillary fibroblasts but not reticular fibroblasts: a new view of skin morphogenesis and aging", PLOS ONE, (2008), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0004066, page E4066, XP002675626

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0004066
    - SORRELL JM; CAPLAN AI, "Fibroblasts-a diverse population at the center of it all", INT REV CELL MOL BIOL, (2009), vol. 276, pages 161 - 214,
    - KALLURI R; ZEISBERG M, "Fibroblasts in cancer", NAT REV CANCER, (2006), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1038/NRC1877, pages 392 - 401, XP002538033

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NRC1877
    - MAIER AB; WESTENDORP RG, "Relation between replicative senescence of human fibroblasts and life history characteristics", AGEING RES REV, (2009), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/j.arr.2009.01.004, pages 237 - 243, XP026160043

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.arr.2009.01.004
    - SCHONHERR E; BEAVAN LA; HAUSSER H; KRESSE H; CULP LA, "Differences in decorin expression by papillary and reticular fibroblasts in vivo and in vitro", BIOCHEM J, (1993), vol. 290, pages 893 - 899, XP000938060
    - SORRELL JM; CAPLAN AI, "Fibroblast heterogeneity: more than skin deep", J CELL SCI, (2004), vol. 117, doi:doi:10.1242/jcs.01005, pages 667 - 675, XP002608405

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.01005
    - AZZARONE B; IEIRA-COELHO A, "Heterogeneity of the kinetics of proliferation within human skin fibroblastic cell populations", J CELL SCI, (1982), vol. 57, pages 177 - 187,
    - HARPER RA; GROVE G, "Human skin fibroblasts derived from papillary and reticular dermis: differences in growth potential in vitro", SCIENCE, (1979), vol. 204, pages 526 - 527,
    - IZUMI T; TAJIMA S; NISHIKAWA T, "Differential expression of alpha 1 and alpha 2 chains of type VI collagen in the upper, middle, and lower dermal fibroblasts in vitro", J BIOCHEM, (1995), vol. 117, pages 1004 - 1007,
    - TAJIMA S; PINNELL SR, "Collagen synthesis by human skin fibroblasts in culture: studies of fibroblasts explanted from papillary and reticular dermis", J INVEST DERMATOL, (1981), vol. 77, pages 410 - 412,
    - FELDMAN SR; TROJANOWSKA M; SMITH EA; LEROY EC, "Differential responses of human papillary and reticular fibroblasts to growth factors", AM J MED SCI, (1993), vol. 305, pages 203 - 207,
    - TAJIMA S; IZUMI T, "Differential in vitro responses of elastin expression to basic fibroblast growth factor and transforming growth factor beta 1 in upper, middle and lower dermal fibroblasts", ARCH DERMATOL RES, (1996), vol. 288, pages 753 - 756,
    - SORRELL JM; BABER MA; CAPLAN AI, "Site-matched papillary and reticular human dermal fibroblasts differ in their release of specific growth factors/cytokines and in their interaction with keratinocytes", J CELL PHYSIOL, (2004), vol. 200, pages 134 - 145,
    - GILCHREST BA; KRUTMANN J, Skin Aging, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG,
    - MAKRANTONAKI E; ZOUBOULIS CC, "Molecular mechanisms of skin aging: state of the art", ANN N YACAD SCI, (2007), vol. 1119, pages 40 - 50,
    - DU P; KIBBE WA; LIN SM, "lumi: a pipeline for processing Illumina microarray", BIOINFORMATICS, (2008), vol. 24, pages 1547 - 1548,
    - SMYTH GK, "Linear models and empirical bayes methods for assessing differential expression in microarray experiments", STAT APPL GENET MOL BIOL, (2004), vol. 3,
    - BENJAMINI Y; HOCHBERG Y, "Controlling the False Discovery Rate - A Practical and Powerful Approach to Multiple Testing", JOURNAL OF THE ROYAL STATISTICAL SOCIETY SERIES B-METHODOLOGICAL, (1995), vol. 57, pages 289 - 300,
    - DENNIS G, JR.; SHERMAN BT; HOSACK DA; YANG J; GAO W; LANE HC; LEMPICKI RA, "DAVID: Database for Annotation, Visualization, and Integrated Discovery", GENOME BIOL, (2003), vol. 4, page 3,
    - VANDESOMPELE J; DE PK; PATTYN F; POPPE B; VAN RN; DE PA; SPELEMAN F, "Accurate normalization of real-time quantitative RT-PCR data by geometric averaging of multiple internal control genes", GENOME BIOL, (2002), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1186/gb-2002-3-7-research0034, XP021021149

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/gb-2002-3-7-research0034
    - SORRELL JM; BABER MA; CAPLAN AI, "Clonal characterization of fibroblasts in the superficial layer of the adult human dermis", CELL TISSUE RES, (2007), vol. 327, doi:doi:10.1007/s00441-006-0317-y, pages 499 - 510, XP055302683

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00441-006-0317-y
    - FREEDMAN BM; RUEDA-PEDRAZA E; WADDELL SP, "The epidermal and dermal changes associated with microdermabrasion", DERMATOL SURG, (2001), vol. 27, pages 1031 - 1033,