Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785875

EP2785875 - A SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHISM ON CHROMOSOME 15 THAT PREDICTS HCV TREATMENT RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]For all designated states
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BENAYED, Ryma
1034 Van Houten Avenue
Clifton, NJ 07013 / US
02 / ESSIOUX, Laurent
6, rue Charles de Gaulle
68220 Attenschwiller / FR
03 / NAVARRO, Mercidita T.
2804 Ruth Court
Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US
04 / PALERMO, Giuseppe
Wettsteinallee 76
4058 Basel / CH
05 / RILEY-GILLIS, Bridget
6 Maple Avenue
West Orange, NJ 07052 / US
06 / ZHU, Yonghong
707 Continental Circle, No. 1632
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
 [2014/41]
Representative(s)Halbig, Dirk
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Patent Department
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[2014/41]
Application number, filing date12790564.426.11.2012
[2016/17]
WO2012EP73554
Priority number, dateUS201161564032P28.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161564032 P
[2014/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013079424
Date:06.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2785875
Date:08.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.06.2013
[2014/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2785875
Date:27.04.2016
Language:EN
[2016/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP06.06.2013
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/70
[2014/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:EINZELNUKLEOTID-POLYMORPHISMUS AUF CHROMOSOM 15 ZUR VORHERSAGE VON HCV-BEHANDLUNGSREAKTIONEN[2014/41]
English:A SINGLE NUCLEOTIDE POLYMORPHISM ON CHROMOSOME 15 THAT PREDICTS HCV TREATMENT RESPONSES[2014/41]
French:POLYMORPHISME DE NUCLÉOTIDE UNIQUE SUR LE CHROMOSOME 15 QUI PRÉDIT LES SENSIBILITÉS VIS-À-VIS D'UN TRAITEMENT CONTRE LE VHC[2014/41]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
03.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.03.2016Fee for grant paid
02.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.11.2015
Opposition(s)30.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.11.2012
AL27.04.2016
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE26.11.2016
MT26.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/43]HU26.11.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE26.11.2016
MT26.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/38]HU26.11.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
BG27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE26.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU26.11.2012
AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CY27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
IS27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
MC27.04.2016
MK27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE26.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/51]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
IE26.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/48]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SI27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/11]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
SM27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/10]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
SK27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/09]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
CZ27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
EE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RO27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
DK27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2017/03]AT27.04.2016
BE27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/52]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
SE27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/51]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
GR28.07.2016
PT29.08.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.04.2016
FI27.04.2016
HR27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
LV27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
RS27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/49]FI27.04.2016
LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
PL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/46]LT27.04.2016
NL27.04.2016
NO27.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL27.04.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2010158866  (ZHU YONGHONG [US]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]WO2011058084  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-8 * * page 13, line 27 - page 14, line 20 *;
 [A]WO2011128278  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-3 *
by applicantUS4897471
 US4695623
    - GHANY MG ET AL., "An Update on Treatment of Genotype 1 Chronic Hepatitis C Virus Infection: 2011 Practice Guideline by the American Association for the Study of Liver Diseases", HEPATOLOGY, (2011), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1002/hep.24641, pages 1433 - 1444, XP055039092

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hep.24641
    - LAVANCHY, D., "Global Surveillance and Control of Hepatitis C: Report of a WHO Consultation", J VIRAL HEPATITIS., (1999), vol. 6, pages 35 - 47
    - "Consensus Statement: EASL/International Consensus Conference on Hepatitis C", J HEPATOL, (1999), vol. 31, no. 1, page 3 8
    - "Recommendations from the National Institutes of Health Consensus Development Conference Statement: Management of Hepatitis C: 2002", HEPATOLOGY, (200211), vol. 36, no. 5, page 1039
    - FRIED MW; SHIFFMAN ML; REDDY KR; SMITH C; MARINOS G; GONCALES FL JR ET AL., "Peginterferon alfa-2a plus rivavirin for chronic hepatitis C virus", NEJM, (20020926), vol. 347, no. 13, pages 975 - 982
    - HADZIYANNIS SJ; SETTE JR. H; MORGAN TR ET AL., "Peginterferon alfa-2a and ribavirin combination therapy in chronic hepatitis C", ANN INT MED, (2004), vol. 140, doi:doi:10.7326/0003-4819-140-5-200403020-00010, pages 346 - 355, XP008165381

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.7326/0003-4819-140-5-200403020-00010
    - MANNS MP; MCHUTCHISON JG; GORDON SC; RUSTGI VK; SHIFFMAN M; REINDOLLAR R; GOODMAN ZD; KOURY K; LING M; ALBRECHT JK, "Peginterferon alfa-2b plus ribavirin compared with interferon alfa-2b plus ribavirin for initial treatment of chronic hepatitis C: a randomised trial", LANCET, (2001), vol. 358, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(01)06102-5, pages 958 - 965, XP004806199

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(01)06102-5
    - SIDWELL RW; ROBINS RK; HILLYARD IW., "Ribavirin: an antiviral agent", PHARMACOL THER, (1979), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/0163-7258(79)90058-5, pages 123 - 146, XP025520794

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0163-7258(79)90058-5
    - GILBERT BE; KNIGHT V., "Minireview: Biochemistry and clinical applications for ribavirin", ANTIMICROB AGENTS CHEMOTHER., (1986), vol. 30, pages 201 - 205
    - DUSHEIKO G; MAIN J; THOMAS H ET AL., "Ribavirin treatment for patients with chronic hepatitis C: Results of a placebo-controlled trial", J HEPATOL, (1996), vol. 25, pages 591 - 598
    - DI BISCEGLIE AM; CONJEEVARAM HS; FRIED MW ET AL., "Ribavirin as therapy for chronic hepatitis C. A randomized, double-blind, placebo-controlled trial", ANN INT MED, (1995), vol. 123, pages 897 - 903
    - CONJEEVARAM HS; FRIED MW; JEFFERS LJ; TERRAULT NA; WILEY-LUCAS TE; AFDHAL N; BROWN RS; BELLE SH; HOOFNAGLE JH; KLEINER DE, "Peginterferon and ribavirin treatment in African American and Caucasian American patients with hepatitis C genotype 1", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2006), vol. 131, doi:doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2006.06.008, pages 470 - 477, XP005587443

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2006.06.008
    - DIENSTAG JL; MCHUTCHISON JG., "American Gastroenterological Association technical review on the management of hepatitis C", GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2006), vol. 130, doi:doi:10.1053/j.gastro.2005.11.010, pages 231 - 264, XP005245699

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1053/j.gastro.2005.11.010
    - MISSIHA S; HEATHCOTE J; ARENOVICH T; KHAN K., "Impact of asian race on response to combination therapy with peginterferon alfa-2a and ribavirin in chronic hepatitis C", AM J GASTRO ENTERO 1, (2007), vol. 102, pages 2181 - 2188
    - REDDY KR; MESSINGER D; POPESCU M; HADZIYANNIS SJ, "Peginterferon alpha-2a (40 kDa) and ribavirin: comparable rates of sustained virological response in sub-sets of older and younger HCV genotype 1 patients", J VIRAL HEPAT, (2009), vol. 16, pages 724 - 731
    - FERENCI P; FRIED MW; SHIFFMAN ML; SMITH CI; MARINOS G; GONCALES FL, JR.; HAUSSINGER D; DIAGO M; CAROSI G; DHUMEAUX D, "Predicting sustained virological responses in chronic hepatitis C patients treated with peginterferon alfa-2a (40 KD)/ribavirin", J HEPATOL, (2005), vol. 43, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jhep.2005.04.009, pages 425 - 433, XP025292958

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhep.2005.04.009
    - MARTINOT-PEIGNOUX M; MAYLIN S; MOUCARI R; RIPAULT MP; BOYER N; CARDOSO AC; GIUILY N; CASTELNAU C; POUTEAU M; STERN C, "Virological response at 4 weeks to predict outcome of hepatitis C treatment with pegylated interferon and ribavirin", ANTIVIR THER, (2009), vol. 14, pages 501 - 511, XP002653150
    - ASSELAH T; BIECHE I; SABBAGH A; BEDOSSA P; MOREAU R; VALLA D; VIDAUD M; MARCELLIN P., "Gene expression and hepatitis C virus infection", GUT, (2009), vol. 58, pages 846 - 858
    - GE D; FELLAY J; THOMPSON AJ; SIMON JS; SHIANNA KV; URBAN TJ; HEINZEN EL; QIU P; BERTELSEN AH; MUIR AJ, "Genetic variation in IL28B predicts hepatitis C treatment-induced viral clearance", NATURE, (2009), vol. 461, pages 399 - 401
    - SUPPIAH V; MOLDOVAN M; AHLENSTIEL G; BERG T; WELTMAN M; ABATE ML; BASSENDINE M; SPENGLER U; DORE GJ; POWELL E, "IL28B is associated with response to chronic hepatitis C interferon-alpha and ribavirin therapy", NAT GENET, (2009), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1038/NG.447, pages 1100 - 1104, XP002601552

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NG.447
    - TANAKA Y; NISHIDA N; SUGIYAMA M; KUROSAKI M; MATSUURA K; SAKAMOTO N; NAKAGAWA M; KORENAGA M; HINO K; HIGE S, "Genome-wide association of IL28B with response to pegylated interferon-alpha and ribavirin therapy for chronic hepatitis C", NAT GENET, (2009), vol. 41, pages 1105 - 1109
 US20080138585