Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2787915

EP2787915 - ELECTROSURGICAL PROBE WITH AN EXPANDABLE SEPARATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2018  [2018/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Olympus Winter & Ibe GmbH
Kuehnstraße 61
22045 Hamburg / DE
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / HÖRLLE, Andreas
Am Vierling 17
14163 Berlin / DE
 [2014/44]
Former [2014/42]01 / HÖRLLE, Andreas
Eschershauser Weg 21a
14163 Berlin / DE
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
[2014/42]
Application number, filing date12790813.502.11.2012
WO2012EP71737
Priority number, dateDE2011108561602.11.2011         Original published format: DE102011085616
[2014/42]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2013064644
Date:10.05.2013
Language:DE
[2013/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2787915
Date:15.10.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2013
[2014/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHIRURGISCHE SONDE MIT EINEM EXPANDIERBAREN TRENNELEMENT[2014/42]
English:ELECTROSURGICAL PROBE WITH AN EXPANDABLE SEPARATING ELEMENT[2014/42]
French:SONDE ÉLECTROCHIRURGICALE AVEC UN SÉPARATEUR EXPANSIBLE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2014National basic fee paid 
02.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
10.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/30]
20.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/30]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2010292687  (KAUPHUSMAN JAMES V [US] ET AL) [X] 1,12,13 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0970718  (CARDIOCOMMAND INC [US]) [X] 1-3,12-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1, 4, 6 *;
 [X]US5921954  (MOHR JR LAWRENCE G [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,12-17 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 22 * * column 5, line 1 - line 19 * * column 5, line 55 - line 60 * * column 8, line 19 - line 61; figure 1A *;
 [A]US5860974  (ABELE JOHN E [US]) [A] 1-3,12-17 * column 6, line 15 - line 53 * * column 8, line 32 - column 9, line 8; figures 1-3 *
by applicantUS7150745
 US7261711
 US7959631
 US8012152