EP2782914 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUBSTITUTED 5-FLUORO-1H-PYRAZOLOPYRIDINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adverio Pharma GmbH Willy-Brandt-Platz 2 12529 Schönefeld / DE | [2015/09] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Str. 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Adverio Pharma GmbH Willy-Brandt-Platz 2 12529 Schönefeld / DE | |||
Former [2014/40] | For all designated states Bayer Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178 13353 Berlin / DE | ||
For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FEY, Peter Am Eickhof 23 42111 Wuppertal / DE | 02 /
GRUNENBERG, Alfons Bismarckstr. 87 42115 Wuppertal / DE | 03 /
BIERER, Donald Horst 9 42781 Haan / DE | [2015/48] |
Former [2014/40] | 01 /
FEY, Peter Am Eickhof 23 42111 Wuppertal / DE | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/31] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2014/40] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12790891.1 | 21.11.2012 | [2018/31] | WO2012EP73276 | Priority number, date | EP20110190789 | 25.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11190789 | EP20110192301 | 07.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11192301 | [2014/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013076168 | Date: | 30.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2782914 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2782914 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/506, A61P9/00 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
A61P9/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D295/104 (IL,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (KR);
C07C303/28 (IL,KR,US);
C07C309/04 (IL,US);
C07C309/65 (IL);
C07C317/04 (IL,KR,US);
C07D265/30 (IL,KR,US);
C07D295/023 (CN);
C07D295/03 (CN);
C07D295/037 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C07C303/28, C07C309/65 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | 25.06.2014 | ME | 25.06.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUBSTITUIERTEN 5-FLUOR-1H-PYRAZOLOPYRIDINEN | [2014/40] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUBSTITUTED 5-FLUORO-1H-PYRAZOLOPYRIDINES | [2014/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE 5-FLUORO-1H-PYRAZOLOPYRIDINES SUBSTITUÉES | [2014/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 19.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15151593.9 / EP2896617 | EP18178621.1 / EP3421470 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | LU | 21.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2019/34] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 21.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | GR | 02.11.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03095451 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [AD] 1-3,6-24 * examples 5,7A,8A; claims 1,4-6,10 *; | [IDP]WO2011147809 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [IDP] 10-19 * page 1, paragraph 1; examples 6A-11A,1; claims 1,4-11 *; | [IP]WO2012028647 (BAYER PHARMA AG [DE], et al) [IP] 10-19* page 1, paragraph 1; examples 25A-31A; claims 1,6-12; table 2 * | Examination | WO2011064156 | by applicant | WO0006569 | WO03004503 | WO03095451 | WO2009018415 | WO2011064156 | WO2011064171 | WO2011147809 | - L.F.CAVALIERI; J.F.TANKER; A.BENDICH, J.AM.CHEM.SOC., (1949), vol. 71, page 533 | - YAMANAKA, S. YAMASHITA; T. ISHIHARA, SYNLETT, (1993), pages 353 - 354 | - H. YAMANAKA; M.KUWABARA; M. OKUDO; K. FUKUNISHI; M. NOMURA, NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI, (1985), pages 1988 - 1994 | - H. YAMANAKA; H. GANBAYASHI; M.KUWABARA; K. FUKUNISHI; M. NOMURA, NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI, (1988), pages 1036 - 1043 | - H. YAMANAKA; S. YAMASHITA; T. ISHIHARA, SYNLETT, (1993), pages 353 - 354 | - MARKOVSKII, L. N.; KOLESNIK, N. P.; SHERMOLOVICH, YU, G ZHURNAL OBSHCHEI KHIMII, (1980), vol. 50, no. 4, pages 826 - 829 |